Jamar L. Hendrix v. Ralph Diaz et al
Plaintiff: Jamar L. Hendrix
Defendant: Anthony Carter, Kenneth J. Pogue, Ralph Diaz, Jeffrey Macomber, Chelsea Armenta, P. Birdsong and Steven Escobar
Case Number: 5:2020cv01897
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93). (ghap)
September 10, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Jamar L. Hendrix. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/15/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/10/2020 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/15/2020.]
September 1, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jamar L. Hendrix. (Reader, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/15/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Reader, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/15/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jamar L. Hendrix. (Reader, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/15/2020.] Modified on 9/15/2020 (ghap). Modified on 9/15/2020 (ghap).
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Chelsea Armenta, P. Birdsong, Anthony Carter, Ralph Diaz, Steven Escobar, Jeffrey Macomber, Kenneth J. Pogue by Jamar L. Hendrix.(Reader, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamar L. Hendrix v. Ralph Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth J. Pogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Armenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Birdsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamar L. Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?