Jesse Chacon Jr v. Ralph Diaz et al
Case Number: 5:2020cv01898
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Eastern Division - Riverside Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) filed by plaintiff Jesse Chacon, Jr. (esa)
September 14, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Jesse Chacon Jr. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/16/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/14/2020 TRANSFERRING this matter to the USDC for the Central District of California. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/16/2020.]
September 9, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jesse Chacon Jr. (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/16/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jesse Chacon, Jr. (Mena-Sanchez, L) Modified on 9/10/2020 (Plummer, M). [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Chelsea Armenta, P. Birdsong, Anthony Carter, Ralph Diaz, Steven Escobar, Jeffrey Macomber, Kenneth J. Pogue by Jesse Chacon, Jr.(Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 9/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jesse Chacon Jr v. Ralph Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?