Norma Esproles v. Jo-Ann Stores, LLC et al
Plaintiff: NORMA ESPROLES
Defendant: JO-ANN STORES, LLC and Does 1 to 100, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2020cv01933
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2021 at 09:00 AM. See order for further details. (jre)
September 23, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Jo-Ann Stores, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/25/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 1 TO NOTICE OF LODGING #9 ). (jp)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Attachments: #1 Jo-Ann Stores, LLC's Conformed State Court Answer to Complaint)(Koo, Jennifer)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice to Counsel Re: Consent Blackout Case - optional html form #6 . Document # 6 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk docketed the Notice to counsel re consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Eastern Division Blackout Case was docketed in error. (ghap)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 9/18/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 7] Notice to counsel re consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Eastern Division Blackout Case. (ghap) Modified on 9/18/2020 (ghap).
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge R. Gary Klausner. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-01933 RGK (SHKx). (ghap)
September 17, 2020 NON CONFORM COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Jo-Ann Stores, LLC., filed by plaintiff Norma Esproles. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JO-ANN STORES, LLC, identifying Norma Esproles; Jo-Ann Stores, LLC; Jo-Ann Holdings, Inc.; Needle Holdings, LLC, Leonard Green Partners, L.P.. (Koo, Jennifer)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant JO-ANN STORES, LLC. (Koo, Jennifer)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVDS2013251 Receipt No: BCACDC-28126865 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant JO-ANN STORES, LLC. (Attorney Jennifer Koo added to party JO-ANN STORES, LLC(pty:dft))(Koo, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norma Esproles v. Jo-Ann Stores, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JO-ANN STORES, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Koo
Represented By: Mike H Madokoro
Represented By: Claire E Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMA ESPROLES
Represented By: Raymond Ghermezian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?