County of Riverside v. Charles Lor et al
Plaintiff: County of Riverside
Defendant: Charles Lor and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Petitioner: COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY
Case Number: 5:2020cv01999
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Riverside. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Riverside. (yl)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT AND ORDER THEREON by Judge John W. Holcomb #8 It is hereby ordered that this action, County of Riverside v. Charles Lor, is remanded back to the Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, MCC 2001632 and any matters currently scheduled in the federal action are taken off calendar. IT IS SO ORDERED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 Case terminated (yl)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by PLAINTIFF County of Riverside. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER TO REMAND TO STATE COURT)(Moore, Sarah)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form, #6 by Deputy Clerk of Court. The document is hereby stricken. (iva)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #5 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Notice of Dismissal should be filed via way of stipulation or by plaintiff In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 [DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN PER DOCUMENT NO. 7] NOTICE Notice of Dismissal filed by Defendant Charles Lor. (Granby, George) Modified on 10/13/2020 (iva).
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Document 1 Civil Cover Sheet and Attachments No. 2 Certificate of Interested Parties should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): A claim initiating document was filed using the incorrect initiating event in CM/ECF. As a result, the case was not properly classified in the CM/ECF System. The error has been corrected by fixing the docket entry. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh)
September 28, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff County of Riverside, upon Defendant Charles Lor served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Charles Lor in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/1/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
September 28, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, Charles Lor, filed by Plaintiff County of Riverside. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/24/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
September 28, 2020 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-28276618 for $400 filing fee. (Granby, George)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed as REQUEST Paid,gov is down with filing fee previously paid (400.00 receipt number Paid.gov is down), filed by Defendant Charles Lor. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Notice of Removal of case to Federal Court, #2 Unredacted Document Certificate of Interested Parties) (Attorney George Granby added to party Charles Lor(pty:bkmov))(Granby, George) Modified on 9/29/2020 (lh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Riverside v. Charles Lor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE, A MUNICIPAL ENTITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Lor
Represented By: George Granby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Riverside
Represented By: Gregory P Priamos
Represented By: Tiffany Nicole North
Represented By: Michelle Clack
Represented By: Sarah K Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?