Larry Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC et al v. City of Palm Springs
Plaintiff: Larry Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC, Sammy G's Inc. and Sharon Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC
Defendant: City of Palm Springs and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 5:2020cv02050
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 43 U.S.C. ยง 0946
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Larry Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC, Sammy G's Inc., Sharon Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Russell, Charles)
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant City of Palm Springs, identifying Larry Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC; Sharon Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC, Sammy G's Inc.. (Egger, Richard)
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to City of Palm Springs answer now due 11/11/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant City of Palm Springs.(Attorney Richard T Egger added to party City of Palm Springs(pty:dft))(Egger, Richard)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Larry Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC, Sammy G's Inc., Sharon Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC, identifying Larry Kramer, Principal of Larry Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC; Sharon Kramer, Principal of Sharon Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC. (Thompson, Robert)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lom)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DEFICIENCIES IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Please take notice that pursuant to Local Rule 7-1.1, a notice of interested parties shall be filed upon a party's first appearance. Counsel shall file a notice of interested parties on or before October 7, 2020. Failure to file the notice may result in the document being stricken. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant City of Palm Springs. (esa)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 Notice to counsel re consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Eastern Division Blackout Case. (esa)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Larry Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC, Sammy G's Inc., Sharon Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC. (Thompson, Robert)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants Larry Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC, Sammy G's Inc., Sharon Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC. (Thompson, Robert)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28345519 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Larry Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC, Sammy G's Inc., Sharon Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC. (Attorney Robert Walter Thompson added to party Larry Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney Robert Walter Thompson added to party Sammy G's Inc.(pty:bkmov), Attorney Robert Walter Thompson added to party Sharon Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Thompson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larry Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC et al v. City of Palm Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC
Represented By: Robert Walter Thompson
Represented By: Alex Andrea Zolg
Represented By: Charles S Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammy G's Inc.
Represented By: Robert Walter Thompson
Represented By: Alex Andrea Zolg
Represented By: Charles S Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Kramer Vineyard Properties, LLC
Represented By: Robert Walter Thompson
Represented By: Alex Andrea Zolg
Represented By: Charles S Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Palm Springs
Represented By: Richard T Egger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?