Gregory Richardson et al v. Doe Clerk et al
Defendant: Presiding Judge DOES, Clerk DOES, Martha Bellinger, COMMISSION ON JUDICIAL PERFORMANCE DOES and CALIFORNIA STATE BAR DOES
Petitioner: Gregory Richardson
Respondent: IVAMS, Inc., California State Bar Doe Attorneys, Peter Eggertsen, California Commission on Juidicial Performance Does and Doe Clerk
Case Number: 5:2020cv02055
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants California Commission on Juidicial Performance Does, California State Bar Doe Attorneys, Doe Clerk, Peter Eggertsen, IVAMS, Inc., Presiding Judge Does. (yl)
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Gregory Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit list of Defendants)(Richardson, Gregory)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice>>Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 PETITION Notice of Interested Parties with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 10/1/2020,, filed by PLAINTIFF Gregory Richardson.(Richardson, Gregory)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Docket item 2 was e-filed under the incorrect event of Petition. The clerk has modified the docket entry to reflect the true name of the document which is a Civil Cover Sheet. (car)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 [CIVIL COVER SHEET] FILED AS PETITION with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 10/1/2020,, filed by PLAINTIFF Gregory Richardson.(Richardson, Gregory) Modified on 10/5/2020 (car).
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION Receipt No: ACACDC-28347601 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Gregory Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Record R) (Attorney Gregory S. Richardson added to party Gregory Richardson(pty:bkmov))(Richardson, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory Richardson et al v. Doe Clerk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presiding Judge DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Bellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSION ON JUDICIAL PERFORMANCE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALIFORNIA STATE BAR DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: IVAMS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California State Bar Doe Attorneys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter Eggertsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Commission on Juidicial Performance Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Doe Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Richardson
Represented By: Gregory S. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?