Emilio Leon et al v. Bedabox, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Emilio Leon, Hugo Garcia and Veronica Garza
Defendant: Jan Bednar, Bedabox, LLC, Does 1 through 20, inclusive and Ignacio Robles
Case Number: 5:2020cv02291
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO REMAND ANDSCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Scheduling Conference set for January 5, 2021, at 10 a.m. and the Motion to Remand hearing set for January 19, 2021, at 10 a.m. both be continued to January 26, 2021, at 10 a.m. (kca)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on the Motion to Remand and the Scheduling Conference from January 5, 2021 and January 19, 2021 to January 26, 2021 Re: Order #12 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino County Superior Court #13 filed by Defendants Bedabox, LLC, Jan Bednar.(Gonzales, Michelle)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Hugo Garcia, Veronica Garza, Emilio Leon. Motion set for hearing on 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (LaCour, Jonathan)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on January 5, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #10 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Bedabox, LLC, Jan Bednar.(Gonzales, Michelle)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Emilio Leon, Hugo Garcia, Veronica Garza(LaCour, Jonathan)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (LaCour, Jonathan)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendants Bedabox, LLC, Jan Bednar. (Gonzales, Michelle)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jan Bednar answer now due 12/4/2020; Bedabox, LLC answer now due 12/4/2020, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Jan Bednar; Bedabox, LLC.(Gonzales, Michelle)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (esa)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to clerical error. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. New Case Number 5:20-cv-02291 SP. (esa)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Bedabox, LLC, Jan Bednar, Does, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Emilio Leon, Hugo Garcia, Veronica Garza. (filed in state court 8/14/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michelle Roberts Gonzales on behalf of Defendants Bedabox, LLC, Jan Bednar (Gonzales, Michelle)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Bedabox, LLC, Jan Bednar, identifying ShipMonk, Inc.. (Gonzales, Michelle)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Bedabox, LLC, Jan Bednar. (Gonzales, Michelle)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVDS 2017407 Receipt No: ACACDC-28791790 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Jan Bednar, Bedabox, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jan Bednar) (Attorney Michelle Roberts Gonzales added to party Bedabox, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle Roberts Gonzales added to party Jan Bednar(pty:dft))(Gonzales, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emilio Leon et al v. Bedabox, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio Leon
Represented By: Lisa Sidney Noveck
Represented By: Jonathan Pierre LaCour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Garcia
Represented By: Lisa Sidney Noveck
Represented By: Jonathan Pierre LaCour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Garza
Represented By: Lisa Sidney Noveck
Represented By: Jonathan Pierre LaCour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Bednar
Represented By: Tao Y Leung
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedabox, LLC
Represented By: Tao Y Leung
Represented By: Michelle Roberts Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ignacio Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?