Michael J. Harrington v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Michael J. Harrington
Defendant: Cathy Otis and United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020cv02308
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS #7 by Judge John W. Holcomb: Accordingly, upon consideration of the Motion, and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED on the ground that this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over this action. The Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice to Harrington pursuing his claims in a forum with appropriate jurisdiction. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See order for further details) ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (yl)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court finds that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 7) is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set on December 11, 2020. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Cathy Otis. Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony Robert Montero, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Thayer, Damon)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER CORRECTING CAPTION by Judge John W. Holcomb. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The name of defendant Cathy Otis shall be deleted from the caption of this case; The USA shall be inserted in the caption in place and stead of Cathy Otis. (See document for further details) #6 (yl)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Cathy Otis. correcting Notice (Other) #5 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Scope of Federal Employment, #2 Proof of Service)(Thayer, Damon)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Substitution filed by Defendant Cathy Otis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Thayer, Damon)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil)
November 5, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Michael J. Harrington in Riverside Superior Court on 3/9/2020, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Cathy Otis. (Thayer, Damon)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number PSS2000489 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendant Cathy Otis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - State Court Complaint and Other Filings, #2 Exhibit - Certification of Scope of Federal Employment, #3 Exhibit - Proof of Service) (Attorney Damon A Thayer added to party Cathy Otis(pty:dft))(Thayer, Damon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael J. Harrington v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Otis
Represented By: Damon A Thayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?