Elise Davis v. Bath and Body Works, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elise Davis
Defendant: BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC, DOES 1 through 50, inclusive and Bath and Body Works, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv02331
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-200) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha, this case is transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to the calendar of Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-02331-FLA(SPx). (ap)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (npo)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #12 , #14 Non-Resident Attorney Cory D. Catignani APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bath and Body Works LLC Defendant, designating Kimberly M. Jansen as local counsel. (twdb)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
November 18, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Elise Davis, identifying Elise Davis. (Bowden, Lindsay)
November 18, 2020 Filing 17 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Elise Davis.. (Bowden, Lindsay)
November 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
November 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jocelyn Marie Hoffman on behalf of Defendant Bath and Body Works, LLC (Attorney Jocelyn Marie Hoffman added to party Bath and Body Works, LLC(pty:dft))(Hoffman, Jocelyn)
November 13, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cory D. Catignani to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bath and Body Works, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 11/12/2020, Receipt No. 28976806) filed by Defendant Bath and Body Works, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Giddens, Brent)
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cory D. Catignani to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bath and Body Works, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28976806) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Application and proposed order are incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cory D. Catignani to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bath and Body Works, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28976806) filed by Defendant Bath and Body Works, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Giddens, Brent)
November 10, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lee A Cirsch counsel for Plaintiff Elise Davis. Adding Lee A. Cirsch as counsel of record for Elise Davis for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiff. (Attorney Lee A Cirsch added to party Elise Davis(pty:pla))(Cirsch, Lee)
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lindsay L Bowden counsel for Plaintiff Elise Davis. Adding Lindsay L. Bowden as counsel of record for Elise Davis for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiff. (Attorney Lindsay L Bowden added to party Elise Davis(pty:pla))(Bowden, Lindsay)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jocelyn M. Hoffman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Cory D. Catignani. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil)
November 6, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Elise Davis in San Bernardino Superior Court on 9/1/2020, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
November 6, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Bath and Body Works, LLC, attached as Exhibit 3. (jtil)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Gretchen Mastellon re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to G. Mastellon Decl.)(Jansen, Kimberly)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC identifying L Brands, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Jansen, Kimberly)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC, identifying Retail Store Operations, Inc.; Intimate Brands Holding, LLC; Intimate Brands, Inc.; L Brands, Inc.. (Jansen, Kimberly)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC. (Jansen, Kimberly)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIV DS 2019599 Receipt No: ACACDC-28899408 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Kimberly Marie Jansen added to party BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC(pty:dft))(Jansen, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elise Davis v. Bath and Body Works, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise Davis
Represented By: Lindsay L Bowden
Represented By: Lee A Cirsch
Represented By: Donald James Aaron Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Marie Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bath and Body Works, LLC
Represented By: Jocelyn Marie Hoffman
Represented By: Cory D. Catignani
Represented By: Brent Mathew Giddens
Represented By: Kimberly Marie Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?