Diane Northington v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: Diane Northington
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv02480
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Diane Northington, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 12/21/2020, answer due 2/19/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Certified Mail Receipts, #3 Certified Mail Receipt)(Yim, Young)
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Attorney Stacy Wiesbrock added to party Andrew M. Saul(pty:dft))(Wiesbrock, Stacy)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. [See Order for details.] (san)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (lh)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Diane Northington. (Yim, Young)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Yim, Young)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Diane Northington. (Yim, Young)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29258679 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Young Bin Yim added to party Diane Northington(pty:pla))(Yim, Young)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diane Northington v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Stacy Wiesbrock
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Northington
Represented By: Young Bin Yim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?