City of Corona et al v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Plaintiff: Corona Utility Authority and City of Corona
Defendant: Shell Oil Company, Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc, DOES 1 through 300 INCLUSIVE, FMC Corporation, Shell Chemical Company, The Dow Chemical Company, Crop Production Services, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company doing business as Shell Chemical Company and DOES 1 through 300, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2020cv02562
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 03/08/21 at 11:00 AM. (pg)
January 13, 2021 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant FMC Corporation (Sobczynski, Linda)
January 13, 2021 Filing 24 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FMC Corporation, identifying FMC Corporation, Vanguard Group, BlackRock, Inc., State Street Corporation. (Sobczynski, Linda)
January 13, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FMC Corporation.(Attorney Linda Teresa Sobczynski added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Sobczynski, Linda)
January 12, 2021 Filing 22 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company, identifying Dow Inc.. (Langner, Bailey)
January 12, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company.(Attorney Bailey J Langner added to party The Dow Chemical Company(pty:dft))(Langner, Bailey)
January 12, 2021 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company identifying Royal Dutch Shell plc as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Jay)
January 12, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company, identifying Plaintiff City of Corona; Plaintiff Corona Utility Authority; Defendant The Dow Chemical Company; Defendant Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., formerly known as "Crop Production Services, Inc."; Defendant FMC Corporation. (Smith, Jay)
January 12, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company.(Attorney Jay E Smith added to party Shell Oil Company(pty:dft))(Smith, Jay)
January 12, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc identifying Nutrien Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Jay)
January 12, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc, identifying Plaintiff City of Corona; Plaintiff Corona Utility Authority; Defendant The Dow Chemical Company; Defendant Shell Oil Company, formerly doing business as "Shell Chemical Company"; Defendant FMC Corporation. (Smith, Jay)
January 12, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.(Attorney Jay E Smith added to party Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc(pty:dft))(Smith, Jay)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-02022-MWF (SPx). Case transferred from Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-02562-MWF (SPx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (aco)
December 28, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority, upon Defendant Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, Intake Specialist, CT Corp., Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sansone, Kenneth)
December 28, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority, upon Defendant Shell Oil Company served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, Intake Specialist, CT Corp., Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sansone, Kenneth)
December 28, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority, upon Defendant FMC Corporation served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, Intake Specialist, CT Corp., Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sansone, Kenneth)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority, upon Defendant The Dow Chemical Company served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, Intake Specialist, CT Corp., Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sansone, Kenneth)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants FMC Corporation, Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc, Shell Oil Company and The Dow Chemical Company. (jtil)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority. per L.R. 83-1.4 (Mansergh, Seth)
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority. Related Case(s): 2:18- cv-10139-MWF-SPx; 5:19-cv-00842-MWF-SPx; 5:20-cv-00881-MWF-SPx; 2:20-cv-07765-MWF-SPx (Mansergh, Seth)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Mansergh, Seth)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment #1 to Summons, #2 Appendix Attachment #2 to Summons)(Mansergh, Seth)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority. (Mansergh, Seth)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29489055 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority. (Attorney Seth D Mansergh added to party City of Corona(pty:pla), Attorney Seth D Mansergh added to party Corona Utility Authority(pty:pla))(Mansergh, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Corona et al v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Jay E Smith
Represented By: Nicole Areli Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Jay E Smith
Represented By: Nicole Areli Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 300 INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Sarah Peterman Bell
Represented By: James Hannon Colopy
Represented By: Kelly M Matayoshi
Represented By: Linda Teresa Sobczynski
Represented By: Elizabeth M Toledo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Chemical Company
Represented By: Jay E Smith
Represented By: Nicole Areli Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crop Production Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jay E Smith
Represented By: Nicole Areli Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company doing business as Shell Chemical Company
Represented By: Alessandra M Givens
Represented By: Bailey J Langner
Represented By: Nicholas D Kayhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 300, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corona Utility Authority
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Corona
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?