Stacey Turman v. PetSmart, Inc.et al
Plaintiff: Stacey Turman
Defendant: DOES 1-25, inclusive,, PETSMART, INC., a Delaware corporation, PetSmart, Inc. and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2020cv02622
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Stipulation for Binding Arbitration *(Dkt. #16 ). NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
January 11, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Order Granting Binding Arbitration filed by Defendant PetSmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ly, Sabrina)
January 4, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Stacey Turman, identifying Stacey Turman; Petsmart, Inc.. (Taylor, Christopher)
January 4, 2021 Filing 14 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Stacey Turman.. (Taylor, Christopher)
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Sabrina M. Punia-Ly re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 re Notice to State Court and Plaintiff of Removal filed by Defendant PetSmart, Inc.. (Ly, Sabrina)
December 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing of State Court File with District Court filed by Defendant PetSmart, Inc.. (Ly, Sabrina)
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant PetSmart, Inc., re Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form, #7 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent Blackout Case - optional html form #9 served on December 22, 2020. (Ly, Sabrina)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on February 25, 2021. (cw)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 Notice to counsel re consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Eastern Division Blackout Case. (ghap)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Cormac J. Carney. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-02622 CJC (SHKx). (ghap)
December 21, 2020 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant PetSmart, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 4)(ghap)
December 21, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Stacey Turman, upon Defendant PetSmart, Inc. served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon 19601 North 27th Avenue, Phoenix, AZ 85027Served via CCP Section 145.40 PetSmart, Inc.'s CEO LK Symancyk Summons and complaint sent certified mail, return receipt, on 11/13/20. Effective 11/23/20 in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/23/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 3) (ghap)
December 21, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 25, inclusive, PetSmart, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Stacey Turman. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/8/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 2) (ghap)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant PETSMART, INC., a Delaware corporation, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Request for Judicial Notice #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Declaration #4 served on December 21, 2020. (Ly, Sabrina)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant PETSMART, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Ly, Sabrina)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Tiffany Uriarte re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant PETSMART, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Ly, Sabrina)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant PETSMART, INC., a Delaware corporation, identifying Argos Holding Inc.. (Ly, Sabrina)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant PETSMART, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Ly, Sabrina)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number MCC2001996 Receipt No: ACACDC-29638336 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant PETSMART, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9) (Attorney Sabrina My-Ngan Ly added to party PETSMART, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:dft))(Ly, Sabrina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stacey Turman v. PetSmart, Inc.et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Turman
Represented By: Taylor Hollis White
Represented By: Philip Horlacher
Represented By: Parham Barkhordar
Represented By: Christopher Wren Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-25, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETSMART, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Sabrina My-Ngan Ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PetSmart, Inc.
Represented By: Sabrina My-Ngan Ly
Represented By: Thy B Bui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?