Renee Johnson v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Renee Johnson
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2020cv02649
Filed: December 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has received the conformed copy of the Answer filed in state court (Dkt. No. #18 ). Accordingly, the Court discharges the Order to Show Cause issued on January 14, 2021 #16 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
January 15, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.to Order to Show Cause #16 Defendant's Supplement to the Amended Notice of Removal - Conformed Copy of Defendant's State Court Answer (Ammons, David)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (LOP) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 1/21/2021. (smo)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
December 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-02649 MCS (SHKx). (lh)
December 29, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., re Errata #7 , Amended Document (Non-Motion) #9 , Amended Document (Non-Motion) #8 , Amended Document (Non-Motion) #10 , Amended Document (Non-Motion) #11 served on December 29, 2020. (Ammons, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. Amendment to Request for Judicial Notice #5 (Ammons, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. Amendment to Declaration #4 (Ammons, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. Amendment to Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 (Ammons, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. Amendment to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Ammons, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. correcting Declaration #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Request for Judicial Notice #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Ammons, David)
December 24, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Renee Johnson. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/06/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
December 24, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on December 24, 2020. (Ammons, David)
December 24, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Ammons, David)
December 24, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of JULIA LEVITSKAIA re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Ammons, David)
December 24, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Ammons, David)
December 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Ammons, David)
December 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, case number CVRI2000091 Receipt No: ACACDC-29704489 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Counsel, #5 Notice of Department Assignment) (Attorney David Wesley Ammons added to party Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ammons, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renee Johnson v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: David Wesley Ammons
Represented By: Julia Levitskaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Johnson
Represented By: Aarin A Zeif
Represented By: Michael A Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?