Rubidoux Community Services District v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Plaintiff: Rubidoux Community Services District
Defendant: Shell Oil Company doing business as Shell Chemical Company, The Dow Chemical Company and DOES 1 through 300, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2021cv00173
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2021 at 11:00 AM. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
March 1, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company, identifying Rubidoux Community Services District (Plaintiff); The Dow Chemical Company (Defendant) and Shell Oil Company, formerly doing business as "Shell Chemical Company" (Defendant). (Smith, Jay)
March 1, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company identifying Royal Dutch Shell plc as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Jay)
March 1, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company.(Attorney Jay E Smith added to party Shell Oil Company(pty:dft))(Smith, Jay)
March 1, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company, identifying Dow Inc. (Langner, Bailey)
March 1, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company.(Attorney Bailey J Langner added to party The Dow Chemical Company(pty:dft))(Langner, Bailey)
February 10, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rubidoux Community Services District, upon Defendant Shell Oil Company served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Intake Specialist, CT Corp., Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sansone, Kenneth)
February 10, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rubidoux Community Services District, upon Defendant The Dow Chemical Company served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Intake Specialist, CT Corp., Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sansone, Kenneth)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-02022 MWF(SPx). Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:21-cv-00173 MWF(SPx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap)
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the Case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:21-cV-173-JGB (SPx). (ghap)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Shell Oil Company, The Dow Chemical Company. (ghap)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge) (ghap)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Rubidoux Community Services District. Related Case(s): Multiple (Mansergh, Seth)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Rubidoux Community Services District. Related Case(s): 2:18- cv-10139-MWF-SPx; 5:19-cv-00842-MWF-SPx; 5:20-cv-00881-MWF-SPx; 2:20-cv-07765-MWF-SPx; 5:20-cv-02562-MWF-SPx (Mansergh, Seth)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rubidoux Community Services District, (Mansergh, Seth)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Rubidoux Community Services District. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Mansergh, Seth)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rubidoux Community Services District. (Mansergh, Seth)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-30316486 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Rubidoux Community Services District. (Attorney Seth D Mansergh added to party Rubidoux Community Services District(pty:pla))(Mansergh, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubidoux Community Services District v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company doing business as Shell Chemical Company
Represented By: Jay E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Alessandra M Givens
Represented By: Bailey J Langner
Represented By: Nicholas D Kayhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 300, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rubidoux Community Services District
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?