Cristina Flores v. Wal Mart Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cristina Flores
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., DOES 1 through 25, Inclusive and Wal Mart Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00260
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (npo)
March 16, 2021 Conformed Copy of ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed in Superior Court, Riverside county 2/16/21 attached to #9, filed by Defendant Wal Mart Associates, Inc. (twdb)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING filed /conformed copy of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint re Answer to Complaint (Discovery) (Suh, Paul)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wal Mart Associates, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 Standing Order served on 02/19/2021. (Suh, Paul)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil)
February 16, 2021 NON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Wal Mart Associates, Inc., attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
February 16, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Cristina Flores in Riverside Superior Court on 12/18/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. sec. 1446(d) filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Suh, Paul)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., identifying Walmart Inc.. (McGeorge, Jennifer)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (McGeorge, Jennifer)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVPS2000481 Receipt No: ACACDC-30558535 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer S. McGeorge in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal Under 28 sections 1332, 1441 and 1446, #2 Exhibit A to McGeorge Declaration - Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to McGeorge Declaration - Defendant's Answer, #4 Exhibit C to McGeorge Declaration - California Secretary of State's Entity Detail for Wall-Mart Associates, Inc., #5 Exhibit D to McGeorge Declaration - California Secretary of State Statement of Information for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., #6 Exhibit E to McGeorge Declaration - State Court Notice of Removal, #7 Proof of Service) (Attorney Jennifer S McGeorge added to party Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.(pty:dft))(McGeorge, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cristina Flores v. Wal Mart Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer S McGeorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer S McGeorge
Represented By: Paul Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Flores
Represented By: Megan Beaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?