Edwin Thomas Snell v. Social Security Administration et al
Plaintiff: Edwin Thomas Snell
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Any and All Unknown Defendants, Garcia, M. Rodriguez, Chavez, Diamond and Williams
Case Number: 5:2021cv00474
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned addressed to Edwin Thomas Snell re Order #5 (hr)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (CROSS MEMORANDA FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. (see document for further details) (et)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (et)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned addressed to Edwin Thomas Snell re Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) #3 (hr)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Edwin Thomas Snell. (ghap)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Any and All Unknown Defendants, Chavez, Diamond, Garcia, M. Rodriguez, Social Security Administration, Williams Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani., filed by plaintiff Edwin Thomas Snell. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwin Thomas Snell v. Social Security Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any and All Unknown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Thomas Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?