American Reliable Insurance Company v. Broan Nutone, LLC et al
Plaintiff: American Reliable Insurance Company
Defendant: Broan Nutone, LLC, Jakel Motors Incorporated, Broan-Nutone, LLC and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2021cv00479
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Scheduling Conference ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff American Reliable Insurance Company.. (Keusseyan, Natalie)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2021 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
March 24, 2021 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
March 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Josephine L. Staton. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:21-cv-00479 JLS (SHKx). (lh)
March 18, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Broan-Nutone, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
March 18, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Broan-Nutone, LLC, Does, Jakel Motors Incorporated, filed by Defendant American Reliable Insurance Company. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/9/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Broan Nutone, LLC. (Mijanovic, Krsto)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Broan Nutone, LLC.. (Mijanovic, Krsto)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Broan Nutone, LLC, (Mijanovic, Krsto)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Broan Nutone, LLC. (Mijanovic, Krsto)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT Answer filed by Defendant Broan Nutone, LLC (Mijanovic, Krsto)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT Complaint filed by Defendant Broan Nutone, LLC (Mijanovic, Krsto)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVRI2100574 Receipt No: ACACDC-30940176 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Broan Nutone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic) (Attorney Krsto Mijanovic added to party Broan Nutone, LLC(pty:dft))(Mijanovic, Krsto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Reliable Insurance Company v. Broan Nutone, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan Nutone, LLC
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jakel Motors Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Represented By: Natasha A Kader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Reliable Insurance Company
Represented By: Natalie Mary Keusseyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?