Valerie Marie Young et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Valerie Marie Young and Joseph Young
Defendant: MOSS BROS CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM, FCA US LLC and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2021cv00622
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 35 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Riverside Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Riverside Superior Court. (iv)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND #22 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. This action is hereby REMANDED to the Superior Court of California (County of Riverside), Case No. RIC2002906. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND (Doc. 22) AND TAKING MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. FRCP 78(b); L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the matter is taken under submission, and the hearing set for November 5, 2021, at 10:30am is VACATED. re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Riverside #22 . (jp)
October 22, 2021 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Riverside #22 Supplemental filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Young, Valerie Marie Young. (Law, Daniel)
October 22, 2021 Filing 31 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Riverside #22 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Young, Valerie Marie Young. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Daniel Law, #2 Supplement Evid. Objection to Lambert Declaration)(Law, Daniel)
October 15, 2021 Filing 30 Opposition In Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Riverside #22 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of SCL iso Opposition, #2 Exhibit A to Atty Decl, #3 Exhibit B to Atty Decl, #4 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah)
June 29, 2021 Filing 29 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L.Staton. (kdu)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/15/2022. (kdu)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 7/2/2021, is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: 8/31/2021. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 2/11/2022. Last Day to Serve Initial Expert Reports: 2/25/2022. Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): 2/25/2022. Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports: 3/25/2022. Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: 4/15/2022. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 4/22/2022. Last Day to File Daubert Motions: 4/29/2022. Last Day to File Other Motions in Limine (Excluding Daubert Motions): 5/20/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2022 at 10:30 AM. (jp)
June 17, 2021 Filing 26 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Young, Valerie Marie Young.. (Lotardo, Regina)
June 8, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff's Joseph Young, Valerie Marie Young, (Law, Daniel)
June 8, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Riverside filed by Plaintiff's Joseph Young, Valerie Marie Young #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
June 4, 2021 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Riverside #22 filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Young, Valerie Marie Young. (Law, Daniel)
June 4, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Riverside filed by Plaintiff's Joseph Young, Valerie Marie Young. Motion set for hearing on 11/5/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion To Remand) (Law, Daniel)
June 4, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Law on behalf of Plaintiffs Joseph Young, Valerie Marie Young (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Joseph Young(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Valerie Marie Young(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
May 25, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, JURY DEMAND. Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Louie, Vernice)
May 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by plaintiffs Valerie Marie Young, Joseph Young against Defendants FCA US LLC, Moss Bros Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, Does 1 through 10, inclusive, with Jury Demand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/7/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 1 OF EXHIBIT OF NOTICE OF FILING #18 ).,(jp)
May 12, 2021 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Regina Lotardo re Order to Show Cause, #13 RE Why Plaintiffs Action should not be Dismissed for Lack of Prosecution filed by Plaintiff Valerie Marie Young. (Lotardo, Regina)
May 12, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs in State Court filed by Valerie Marie Young Joseph Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint)(Lotardo, Regina)
May 12, 2021 Filing 17 Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA North America Holdings, LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.; Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric)
May 11, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel. No fee required, filed by Plaintiff Valerie Marie Young, Joseph Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service) (Attorney Regina Lotardo added to party Joseph Young(pty:pla), Attorney Regina Lotardo added to party Valerie Marie Young(pty:pla))(Lotardo, Regina)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton. A Scheduling Conference is set for 7/2/2021 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge Josephine L. Staton. See attached Order for details. (rrp)
May 10, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 04/07/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 1 OF EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF FILING #14 ). (jp)
May 10, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric)
May 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than 5/17/2021, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further information). (jp)
April 14, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant FCA US LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #11 , Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form, #9 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #10 served on 4/14/2021. (Sentlinger, Eric)
April 13, 2021 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
April 13, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Josephine L. Staton. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:21-cv-00622 JLS (SHKx). (jtil)
April 8, 2021 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Valerie Marie Young and Joseph Young in Los Angeles Superior Court on 1/27/2021, attached as Exhibit B to Lambert Decl. (jtil)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy Patricia Maclear on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Amy Patricia Maclear added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Maclear, Amy)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric D Sentlinger on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Eric D Sentlinger added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Sentlinger, Eric)
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Vernice Trina Louie on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Vernice Trina Louie added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Louie, Vernice)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA North America Holdings, LLC, FCA Holdco B.V., Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC2002906 Receipt No: ACACDC-31069777 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah Lambert iso Removal, #2 Exhibit A to SL Decl iso Removal, #3 Exhibit B to SL Decl iso Removal, #4 Exhibit C to SL Decl iso Removal, #5 Exhibit D to SL Decl iso Removal, #6 Exhibit E to SL Decl iso Removal, #7 Exhibit F to SL Decl iso Removal, #8 Exhibit G to SL Decl iso Removal, #9 Exhibit H to SL Decl iso Removal, #10 Exhibit I to SL Decl iso Removal, #11 Exhibit J to SL Decl iso Removal, #12 Exhibit K to SL Decl iso Removal, #13 Exhibit L to SL Decl iso Removal, #14 Exhibit M to SL Decl iso Removal, #15 Exhibit N to SL Decl iso Removal, #16 Exhibit O to SL Decl iso Removal, #17 Exhibit P to SL Decl iso Removal, #18 Exhibit Q to SL Decl iso Removal, #19 Exhibit R to SL Decl iso Removal, #20 Exhibit S to SL Decl iso Removal, #21 Exhibit T to SL Decl iso Removal, #22 Exhibit U to SL Decl iso Removal, #23 Exhibit V to SL Decl iso Removal, #24 Exhibit W to SL Decl iso Removal, #25 Exhibit X to SL Decl iso Removal, #26 Exhibit Y to SL Decl iso Removal, #27 Exhibit Z to SL Decl iso Removal, #28 Exhibit AA to SL Decl iso Removal, #29 Exhibit BB to SL Decl iso Removal, #30 Exhibit CC to SL Decl iso Removal, #31 Exhibit DD to SL Decl iso Removal, #32 Exhibit EE to SL Decl iso Removal, #33 Exhibit FF to SL Decl iso Removal, #34 Exhibit GG to SL Decl iso Removal, #35 Exhibit HH to SL Decl iso Removal, #36 Exhibit II to SL Decl iso Removal, #37 Exhibit JJ to SL Decl iso Removal, #38 Exhibit KK to SL Decl iso Removal, #39 Exhibit LL to SL Decl iso Removal, #40 Exhibit MM to SL Decl iso Removal, #41 Exhibit NN to SL Decl iso Removal, #42 Exhibit OO to SL Decl iso Removal, #43 Exhibit PP to SL Decl iso Removal, #44 Exhibit QQ to SL Decl iso Removal, #45 Exhibit RR to SL Decl iso Removal, #46 Exhibit SS to SL Decl iso Removal, #47 Exhibit TT to SL Decl iso Removal, #48 Exhibit UU to SL Decl iso Removal, #49 Exhibit VV to SL Decl iso Removal, #50 Exhibit WW to SL Decl iso Removal, #51 Exhibit XX to SL Decl iso Removal, #52 Exhibit YY to SL Decl iso Removal, #53 Exhibit ZZ to SL Decl iso Removal, #54 Exhibit AAA to SL Decl iso Removal, #55 Exhibit BBB to SL Decl iso Removal, #56 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Lambert, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valerie Marie Young et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOSS BROS CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Amy Patricia Maclear
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert
Represented By: Vernice Trina Louie
Represented By: Eric D Sentlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Marie Young
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Regina Lotardo
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Young
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Regina Lotardo
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?