Erin Pino v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Erin Pino
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2021cv00785
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 7402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Erin Pino, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #12 served on 6/8/2021. (Broyles, Joseph)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
May 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney Erin Pino, identifying Erin Pino. (Broyles, Joseph)
May 6, 2021 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Erin Pino. (Broyles, Joseph)
May 6, 2021 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to United States Attorney General (car)
May 6, 2021 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (car)
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (car)
May 5, 2021 (Broyles, Joseph)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Attorney Erin Pino. (Broyles, Joseph)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Attorney Erin Pino. (Broyles, Joseph)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Attorney Erin Pino. (Broyles, Joseph)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Attorney Erin Pino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B") (Attorney Joseph A Broyles added to party Erin Pino(pty:pla))(Broyles, Joseph) [FEE $402 Paid 5/5/2021 Receipt No. ACACDC-31245690] Modified on 5/6/2021 (car).
May 4, 2021 (Broyles, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erin Pino v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Pino
Represented By: Joseph A Broyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?