United States of America v. James Scott Sparkman
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: James Scott Sparkman
Case Number: 5:2021cv00788
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1 to 2 days, filed by Plaintiff United States of America.. (Greene, Gavin)
June 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant James Scott Sparkman.(Attorney Chad Nardiello added to party James Scott Sparkman(pty:dft))(Nardiello, Chad)
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant James Scott Sparkman served on 5/11/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Scott Sparkman Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Greene, Gavin)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant James Scott Sparkman. (esa)
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (esa)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Greene, Gavin)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Greene, Gavin)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attorney Gavin L Greene added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Greene, Gavin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. James Scott Sparkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Scott Sparkman
Represented By: Chad Nardiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Gavin L Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?