Jesus Christina Reynoso et al v. Jose Ignacio Rosario-Penaloza et al
Plaintiff: Nhadine Reynoso, Abel Reynoso and Jesus Christina Reynoso
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management, Jose Ignacio Rosario-Penaloza, DOES 1-50, Inclusive,, Joel Cameron Miner, Does 1-50, Inclusive and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Counter Defendant: Roes
Case Number: 5:2021cv00835
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #11 filed by Defendants Bureau of Land Management, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Marquez, Christina)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER #14 by Judge John W. Holcomb. IT IS ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference is continued to July 30, 2021, at 11:00 a.m., and the Joint Rule 26(f) Report is due on July 16, 2021. (lom)
June 30, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Attorney. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 29, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Anthony Poull counsel for Defendant Jose Ignacio Rosario-Penaloza, Counter Claimant Jose Ignacio Rosario-Penaloza. Heather B. Osuna is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Jose Ignacio Rosario Panaloza. (Attorney David Anthony Poull added to party Jose Ignacio Rosario-Penaloza(pty:cc))(Poull, David)
June 28, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Joint Rule 26(f) Report Dates filed by Defendants Bureau of Land Management, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina Marquez, #2 Proposed Order)(Marquez, Christina)
June 28, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Anthony Poull counsel for Defendant Jose Ignacio Rosario-Penaloza. Adding David A. Poull as counsel of record for Jose Ignacio Rosario Pensaloza for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Jose Ignacio Rosario Panaloza. (Attorney David Anthony Poull added to party Jose Ignacio Rosario-Penaloza(pty:dft))(Poull, David)
June 25, 2021 Filing 12 PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #11 filed by Plaintiffs Abel Reynoso, Jesus Christina Reynoso, Nhadine Reynoso. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Vincent J. Bledsoe, #2 Exhibit A-1 Administrative Claim-Abel Reynoso, #3 Exhibit A-2 Administrative Claim-Jesus Reynoso, #4 Exhibit A-3.1 Administrative Claim-Nhadine Reynoso, #5 Exhibit A-3.2 Administrative Claim-Nhadine Reynoso, #6 Exhibit B Returned Mail Receipt-Abel Reynoso, #7 Exhibit C Certified Mail Return Slip-Jesus Reynoso, #8 Exhibit D Certified Mail Return Slip-Nhadine Reynoso, #9 Exhibit E Certified Mail Return Slip-Abel Reynoso, #10 Exhibit F Claim Denial-Nhadine Reynoso, #11 Exhibit G Claim Denial-Abel Reynoso, #12 Exhibit H Meet and Confer, #13 Declaration Declaration of Mary Palmer)(Bledsoe, Vincent)
June 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants Bureau of Land Management, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ericka Howard, #2 Declaration of Christina Marquez with Exhibits 1-4, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Christina Alejandra Marquez added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:dft)) (Marquez, Christina)
June 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
June 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
June 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CORRECTING CAPTION #5 by Judge John W. Holcomb. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The name of Defendant JOEL CAMERON MINER shall be deleted from the caption of this case. The United States of America shall be inserted in the caption in place and instead of JOEL CAMERON MINER. (See document for further details) (yl)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bureau of Land Management answer now due 6/17/2021; Joel Cameron Miner answer now due 6/17/2021, filed by Defendants Bureau of Land Management; Joel Cameron Miner. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Marquez, Christina)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Substitution filed by Defendants Bureau of Land Management, Joel Cameron Miner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Correcting Caption, #2 Proof of Service)(Marquez, Christina)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car)
May 11, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Jose Ignacio Rosario-Penaloza. Filed in State Court on 2/18/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal #1 (Attorney Heather B Osuna added to party Jose Ignacio Rosario-Penaloza(pty:dft))(car)
May 11, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bureau of Land Management, Does 1-50, Inclusive, Joel Cameron Miner, Jose Ignacio Rosario-Penaloza. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Jesus Christina Reynoso, Nhadine Reynoso, Abel Reynoso. Filed in State Court on 11/6/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
May 11, 2021 COUNTERCLAIM [FILED AS CROSS COMPLAINT IN STATE COURT] against Counter Defendants Bureau of Land Management, Joel Cameron Miner, Jesus Christina Reynoso, Roes 1 to 50, filed by Defendant and Counter Claimant Jose Ignacio Rosario-Penaloza. Filed in State Court on 2/18/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
May 11, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Counter Claimant Jose Ignacio Rosario-Penaloza pursuant to FRCP 41a(1). Without prejudice as to Counter Defendant Jesus Christina Reynoso. Filed in State Court on 5/4/2021 Submitted with Exhibit D to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 5/12/2021 (car).
May 11, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Counter Claimant Jose Ignacio Rosario-Penaloza pursuant to FRCP 41a(1). Without prejudice as to Counter Defendants Bureau of Land Management, Joel Cameron Miner. Filed in State Court on 4/26/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 5/12/2021 (car).
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Bureau of Land Management, Joel Cameron Miner. (Marquez, Christina)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California for the County of Riverside, case number CVPS2000029 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendant Bureau of Land Management, Joel Cameron Miner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Christina Alejandra Marquez added to party Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Alejandra Marquez added to party Joel Cameron Miner(pty:dft))(Marquez, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jesus Christina Reynoso et al v. Jose Ignacio Rosario-Penaloza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Christina Alejandra Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Ignacio Rosario-Penaloza
Represented By: David Anthony Poull
Represented By: Heather Brittney Osuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50, Inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Cameron Miner
Represented By: Christina Alejandra Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Christina Alejandra Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nhadine Reynoso
Represented By: Vincent Joseph Bledsoe
Represented By: Walter T Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Reynoso
Represented By: Vincent Joseph Bledsoe
Represented By: Walter T Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Christina Reynoso
Represented By: Vincent Joseph Bledsoe
Represented By: Walter T Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?