Rochelle Vara v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rochelle Vara
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., The Cooper Companies, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Womens Health, Inc., Teva Womens Health, LLC and Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R and D, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00943
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 14 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Northern District of Georgia, 1:21-cv-02563 filed 6/24/2021. (iv)
June 22, 2021 Filing 13 Conditional Transfer Order - 25 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2974, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Georgia and assigned to Honorable Leigh Martin May. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
June 8, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R and D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Womens Health, Inc., Teva Womens Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on 06/03/2021. (Jones, Allison)
June 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
June 3, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R and D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Womens Health, Inc., Teva Womens Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Rochelle Vara. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/11/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant The Cooper Companies, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Teva Womens Health, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Teva Women's Health, LLC.(Jones, Allison)
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC..(Jones, Allison)
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant CooperSurgical, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Womens Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc., (Jones, Allison)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Womens Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Jones, Allison)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of San Bernardino County, California, case number CIV SB 2106762 Receipt No: ACACDC-31399825 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants The Cooper Companies, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Womens Health, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party CooperSurgical, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Teva Women's Health, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Teva Womens Health, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party The Cooper Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jones, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rochelle Vara v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Represented By: Kevin W Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Represented By: Kevin W Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Represented By: Kevin W Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Womens Health, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Represented By: Kevin W Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Womens Health, LLC
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Represented By: Kevin W Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R and D, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Represented By: Kevin W Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Vara
Represented By: Lauren A Welling
Represented By: Timothy M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?