Blanca A. Gonzalez v. FCA US LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Blanca A. Gonzalez
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Moss Bros Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram San Bernardino
Case Number: 5:2021cv00977
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: In light of the Notice of Settlement sent via email by counsel indicating that the case has settled, this action is placed in inactive status. By August 29, 2022, the parties shall file either (1) a Stipulation of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); (2) a Stipulation for an Order of Dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2); or (3) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to comply with this Order in a timely manner, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of August 31, 2022. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. (JS-6) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 26, 2022 Filing 88 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. Kareem Shereef Aref is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 22, 2022 Filing 87 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 [PROPOSED] JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER)(Pardo, Matthew)
July 22, 2022 Filing 86 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez.. (Pardo, Matthew)
July 22, 2022 Filing 85 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Pardo, Matthew)
July 22, 2022 Filing 84 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez.. (Pardo, Matthew)
July 22, 2022 Filing 83 STATEMENT of the Case filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez (Pardo, Matthew)
July 22, 2022 Filing 82 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 15, 2022 Filing 81 Opposition In Opposition to re: MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude Expert Opinions Based on Speculation and Hypothetical Scenarios or Which Will Not Aid the Trier of Fact #65 filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Pardo, Matthew)
July 15, 2022 Filing 80 Opposition In Opposition to re: MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude Evidence Not Produced in Discovery #64 filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Pardo, Matthew)
July 15, 2022 Filing 79 Opposition In Opposition to re: MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude Alleged Problems After the Filing of the Complaint #63 filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Pardo, Matthew)
July 15, 2022 Filing 78 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez.. (Pardo, Matthew)
July 15, 2022 Filing 77 Joint Proposed Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez.. (Pardo, Matthew)
July 15, 2022 Filing 76 Opposition In Opposition to re: MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Exclude Evidence of Alleged NonConformities Not Presented #62 filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Pardo, Matthew)
July 15, 2022 Filing 75 Opposition In Opposition to re: MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Negative Press Coverage of the "Automotive Industry" #61 filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Pardo, Matthew)
July 15, 2022 Filing 74 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo counsel for Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. Adding Matthew Pardo as counsel of record for Blanca A. Gonzalez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Blanca A. Gonzalez(pty:pla))(Pardo, Matthew)
July 15, 2022 Filing 73 Opposition in Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR FINANCING #59 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 15, 2022 Filing 72 Opposition in Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO ATTORNEYS FEES #58 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 15, 2022 Filing 71 Opposition in Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING OR RELATING TO DEFENDANTS ARBITRATION PROGRAM OR QUALIFED THIRD PARTY DISPUTE RESOLUTION PROCESS #57 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 15, 2022 Filing 70 Opposition in Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS #56 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 15, 2022 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 13, 2022 Filing 68 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: MOTION IN LIMINES #57 , #60 , #65 , #59 , #58 , #63 , #56 by Judge John W. Holcomb. The document is accepted as filed. The Court hereby sets a hearing on the Motions in Limine [ECF Nos. 62, 57, 60, 65, 59, 58, 64, 63, and 56] for July 29, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. and directs the moving party to give notice. (yl)
July 13, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents regarding MOTION IN LIMINES ( #62 , #57 , #60 , #65 , #59 , #58 , #64 , #63 , and #56 . The following error(s) was/were found: The hearing information is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
July 11, 2022 Filing 66 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christine J Haw counsel for Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. Adding Christine Haw as counsel of record for Blanca A. Gonzalez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Blanca A. Gonzalez(pty:pla))(Haw, Christine)
July 8, 2022 Filing 65 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (5) to Exclude Expert Opinions Based on Speculation and Hypothetical Scenarios or Which Will Not Aid the Trier of Fact filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 8, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude Evidence Not Produced in Discovery filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to MIL 3, #2 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 8, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude Alleged Problems After the Filing of the Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to MIL 3., #2 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 8, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Exclude Evidence of Alleged NonConformities Not Presented filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to MIL 2, #2 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 8, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Negative Press Coverage of the "Automotive Industry" filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to FCA's MIL.1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 8, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO ATTORNEY MARKETING OR ADVERTISING filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO ATTORNEY MARKETING OR ADVERTISING)(Haw, Christine)
July 8, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR FINANCING filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR FINANCING)(Haw, Christine)
July 8, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO ATTORNEYS FEES filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO ATTORNEYS FEES)(Haw, Christine)
July 8, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING OR RELATING TO DEFENDANTS ARBITRATION PROGRAM OR QUALIFED THIRD PARTY DISPUTE RESOLUTION PROCESS filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ON PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO DEFENDANTS ARBITRATION PROGRAM)(Haw, Christine)
July 8, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ON PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS, #2 Declaration OF CHRISTINE HAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE)(Haw, Christine)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE AUGUST 5, 2022 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND AUGUST 22, 2022 TRIAL AND DISCOVERY CUT OFF by Judge John W. Holcomb #54 . (yl)
July 1, 2022 Filing 54 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Pre-Trial Conference from August 22, 2022 to December 5, 2022 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 1, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Suarez, Jeanette)
July 1, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: GRANTING #50 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Spencer Peter Hugret for FCA US LLC. Attorney Michael Chung and Richard L Stuhlbarg terminated (yl)
June 28, 2022 Filing 50 First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Spencer P. Hugret in place of attorney Richard L. Stuhlbarg / Michael Chung filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Stuhlbarg, Richard)
June 14, 2022 Filing 49 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 19, 2022 Filing 48 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District John W. Holcomb. Effective Monday, May 23, 2022, Judge John W. Holcomb will be located in the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 9D, on the 9th Floor, located at 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California 92701-4516. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9D of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Judge Holcomb's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, may be reached at JWH_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb #12 . It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiffs Confidential Settlement Conference Statement is WITHDRAWN and SEALED. 2. The Clerk is DIRECTED to SEAL Plaintiffs Confidential Settlement Conference Statement [ECF No. 44]. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
May 12, 2022 Filing 46 Notice of Withdrawal of Statement #44 filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tirmizi, Rabiya)
May 9, 2022 Filing 45 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kareem Shereef Aref counsel for Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. Adding Kareem Aref as counsel of record for Blanca A. Gonzalez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Attorney Kareem Shereef Aref added to party Blanca A. Gonzalez(pty:pla))(Aref, Kareem)
May 6, 2022 Filing 44 STATEMENT Plaintiff's Confidential Settlement Conference Statement filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez (Tirmizi, Rabiya)
April 26, 2022 Filing 43 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Blanca A. Gonzalez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Blanca A. Gonzalez(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani re Stipulation for Protective Order #39 . (see document for details) (hr)
March 18, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Revisions of First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redline Version of First Amended Complaint)(Kuemerle, Karin)
March 18, 2022 Filing 40 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, FCA US LLC, Moss Bros Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram San Bernardino amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kuemerle, Karin)
March 16, 2022 Filing 39 REQUEST for Protective Order for Confidential Documents filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.(Chung, Michael)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT #37 by Judge John W. Holcomb. The Stipulation is GRANTED.Defendant FCA US, LLCs Answer filed in response to the original Complaint (Dkt. document 1, attachment 11, entered 6/10/2021) shall serve as Defendants response to the First Amended Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
March 14, 2022 Filing 37 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation to Amend Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint for Violation of Statutory Obligation)(Kuemerle, Karin)
March 3, 2022 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi counsel for Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. Adding Rabiya Tirmizi as counsel of record for Blanca Gonzalez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Blanca Gonzalez. (Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Blanca A. Gonzalez(pty:pla))(Tirmizi, Rabiya)
February 18, 2022 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karin Kuemerle counsel for Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. Adding Karin Kuemerle as counsel of record for Blanca Gonzalez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Blanca Gonzalez. (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Blanca A. Gonzalez(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
January 31, 2022 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Chung counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Michael Chung as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attorney Michael Chung added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Chung, Michael)
January 31, 2022 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mikaela Marie Jackson counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Mikaela M. Jackson is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Jackson, Mikaela)
January 29, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 18, 2021 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. Regina Lotardo is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Blanca Gonzalez. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 7, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/22/2021 at 9:40 a.m. re Transcript #29 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Ponce, Myra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 7, 2021 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/22/2021 at 9:40 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Myra L. Ponce, CSR, RDR, CRR, e-mail address myraponce@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/28/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2022. (Ponce, Myra)
October 28, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 09/24/2021 at 9:00 a.m. re Transcript #27 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Ponce, Myra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 28, 2021 Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 09/24/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Myra L. Ponce, CSR, RDR, CRR, e-mail address myraponce@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/18/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2022. (Ponce, Myra)
October 22, 2021 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER OF VIDEO HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS Hearing held before Judge John W. Holcomb: Counsel for Plaintiff, Tionna Dolin, and her firm, Strategic Legal Practices APC are sanctioned jointly in sum of $900.00. Plaintiff's counsel are DIRECTED to remit payment in the sum of $900.00, made payable to the order of Bowman and Brooke LLP, no later than November 5, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (yl)
October 8, 2021 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Daniel Law re Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #24 Re: Attorneys' Fees and Costs [ECF No. 19] Pursuant to Rulle 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Law, Daniel)
October 8, 2021 Filing 24 BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. regarding Order,, #22 . (Law, Daniel)
October 8, 2021 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Richard L. Stuhlbarg re Order,, #22 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Stuhlbarg, Richard)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS [ECF No. 19] PURSUANT TO RULE 11 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Gonzalez's Counsel is DIRECTED to show cause why their conduct in open court at the hearing on the Motion, in the filings, and as otherwise described herein does not violate Rule 11(b) and L.R. 11-9. Gonzalez's Counsel is advised that this Supplemental OSC constitutes notice under Rule 11(c)(1). Gonzalez's Counsel is DIRECTED to respond in writing to this Supplemental OSC by October 8, 2021, at 12:00 noon (See document for further details) (yl)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 5/13/2022. (yl)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. Deadline for Initial Designation of Expert Witnesses: 5/9/2022; Last day to Conduct Settlement; Conference: 5/13/2022; Deadline for Designation of Rebuttal Expert Witnesses: 5/23/2022; All Discovery Cut-Off (including hearing of discovery motions): 6/6/2022; Dispositive Motion Hearing Cut-Off: 7/1/2022; Deadline for Hearing on Motions in Limine: 7/29/2022 at 9:00 a.m.; Final Pretrial Conference: 8/5/2022 at 11:00 a.m.; Jury Trial: 8/22/2022 at 9:00 a.m. (See document for further details) (yl)
September 24, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER RE:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND [ECF No. 9]; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; & ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Motion Hearing held before Judge John W. Holcomb: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [ECF No. 9] is DENIED. The Court hereby DIRECTS Plaintiffs Counsel to respond in writing by Friday, October 8, 2021, at 12:00 noon to the Order to Show Cause. The Court further DIRECTS Mr. Stuhlbarg, counsel for Defendant FCA US,LLC, to file by Friday, October 8, 2021, at 12:00 noon, a declaration documenting thefees and costs that Defendant has incurred in responding to Plaintiffs Motion toRemand. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (yl)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [ECF No. #9 ], is ordered CONTINUED from September 17, 2021 to September 24, 2021, at 9:00 a.m., via video conference. Furthermore, the Scheduling Conference is ADVANCED from September 24, 2021, at 11:00 a.m., to September 24, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. To obtain the video conference link for the scheduled hearing, the parties are directed to Judge Holcomb's Procedures and Schedules page on the Court's website: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-w-holcomb. Please follow the instructions listed under "Zoom Webinar Hearings." IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #16 by Judge John W. Holcomb. IT IS ORDERED THAT Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez and Defendant FCA US LLCs Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference is GRANTED and the Scheduling Conference is hereby CONTINUED. The new Scheduling Conference date is September 24, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
September 10, 2021 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 17, 2021 to September 24, 2021 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice, 13 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Stuhlbarg ISO Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference, #2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference)(Jackson, Mikaela)
September 3, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Bernardino #9 filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Law, Daniel)
August 27, 2021 Filing 14 OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Bernardino #9 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mikaela M. Jackson in Support of FCA US LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A)(Jackson, Mikaela)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Scheduling Conference, is ordered CONTINUED from August 20, 2021 to September 17, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 5, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7, filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet)(Lotardo, Regina)
August 5, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Regina Lotardo counsel for Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. Adding Regina Lotardo as counsel of record for Blanca A. Gonzalez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Attorney Regina Lotardo added to party Blanca A. Gonzalez(pty:pla))(Lotardo, Regina)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Bernardino #9 filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (Law, Daniel)
August 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Bernardino filed by Plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. Motion set for hearing on 9/17/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of Daniel Law In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Blanca A. Gonzalez(pty:pla)) (Law, Daniel)
June 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
June 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (esa)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Shashi H. Kewalramani. New Case Number 5:21-cv-00977 JWH (SHKx). (esa)
June 9, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, FCA US LLC, Moss Bros Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram San Bernardino, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez. (filed in state court 12/16/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
June 9, 2021 COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Blanca A. Gonzalez as to Moss Bros Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram San Bernardino. (submitted as document 1, attachment 8) (esa)
June 9, 2021 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant FCA US LLC. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 11)(esa)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying Blanca Gonzalez- Plaintiff; FCA US LLC- Defendant. (Jackson, Mikaela)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Jackson, Mikaela)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVSB2028936 Receipt No: ACACDC-31438325 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard L. Stuhlbarg, #2 Declaration of Mikaela M. Jackson, #3 Exhibit A to MMJ Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to MMJ Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to MMJ Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to MMJ Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to MMJ Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to MMJ Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to MMJ Declaration, #10 Exhibit H to MMJ Declaration, #11 Exhibit I to MMJ Declaration, #12 Exhibit J to MMJ Declaration, #13 Exhibit K to MMJ Declaration) (Attorney Mikaela Marie Jackson added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Jackson, Mikaela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanca A. Gonzalez v. FCA US LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Mikaela Marie Jackson
Represented By: Richard L Stuhlbarg
Represented By: Michael Chung
Represented By: Jeanette Catuira Suarez
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moss Bros Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram San Bernardino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca A. Gonzalez
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Regina Lotardo
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Kareem Shereef Aref
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?