City of Corona et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: City of Corona and Corona Utility Authority
Defendant: 3M Company, E. I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, Corteva, Inc., DuPont De Nemours, Inc., Decra Roofing Systems, Inc. and Doe Defendants
Case Number: 5:2021cv01156
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 43 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Riverside County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Riverside County Superior Court. (mrgo)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT 3M'S MOTION TO STAY AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #26 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court and #31 MOTION to Stay Case. Case Remanded to Riverside County Superior Court, CVRI2100800. (See document for details). (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (mrgo)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING NOTICE IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss defendant 3M Company filed by defendant 3M Company; #26 MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by plaintiffs; and #31 MOTION to Stay Case pending Transfer Decision by Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation filed by Defendant 3M Company - The motions are submitted. Order to issue. The hearing scheduled for 8/23/2021 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 16, 2021 Filing 40 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Transfer Decision by Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation #31 filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Queen)(Queen, Daniel)
August 11, 2021 Filing 39 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION to Stay Case pending Transfer Decision by Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation #31 - The motion hearing previously scheduled for 08/30/2021 at 1:30 p.m. has been rescheduled to 8/23/2021 at 01:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 9, 2021 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Daniel S. Robinson in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Transfer Decision by Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation #31 filed by Plaintiffs City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Robinson, Daniel)
August 9, 2021 Filing 37 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Transfer Decision by Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation #31 filed by Plaintiffs City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority. (Robinson, Daniel)
August 9, 2021 Filing 36 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant 3M Company #24 filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Queen, Daniel)
August 9, 2021 Filing 35 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #26 filed by Plaintiffs City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority. (Robinson, Daniel)
August 2, 2021 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Daniel S. Robinson in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant 3M Company #24 filed by Plaintiffs City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Robinson, Daniel)
August 2, 2021 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant 3M Company #24 filed by Plaintiffs City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority. (Robinson, Daniel)
August 2, 2021 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #26 filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Queen, Daniel)
August 2, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Transfer Decision by Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation filed by Defendant 3M Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/30/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Queen, Daniel)
July 30, 2021 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tala Toufanian Jayadevan counsel for Defendant Decra Roofing Systems, Inc.. Adding Tala Toufanian Jayadevan as counsel of record for Decra Roofing Systems, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Decra Roofing systems, Inc.. (Attorney Tala Toufanian Jayadevan added to party Decra Roofing Systems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jayadevan, Tala)
July 28, 2021 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin Keevin Kim counsel for Defendant Decra Roofing Systems, Inc.. Kevin Keevin Kim is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT DECRA ROOFING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Kim, Kevin)
July 26, 2021 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Tom Moody in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #26 filed by Plaintiffs City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Robinson, Daniel)
July 26, 2021 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Daniel S. Robinson in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #26 filed by Plaintiffs City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Robinson, Daniel)
July 26, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by plaintiffs City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority. Motion set for hearing on 8/23/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Robinson, Daniel)
July 22, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant 3M Company, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant 3M Company #24 served on July 22, 2021. (Queen, Daniel)
July 22, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant 3M Company filed by defendant 3M Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/23/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Tom Boer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order) (Queen, Daniel)
July 22, 2021 Filing 23 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiffs City of Corona, Corona Utility Authority.. (Robinson, Daniel)
July 19, 2021 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants E. I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #18 , Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction FRCP Rule 12(b)(2)) #15 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #20 served on July 19, 2021. (Mortl, Andrew)
July 19, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Decra Roofing Systems, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/22/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Kevin Kim, #3 Proposed Order) (Kim, Kevin)
July 19, 2021 Filing 20 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Chemours Company, identifying N/A. (Mortl, Andrew)
July 19, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Decra Roofing Systems, Inc., identifying Decra Holdings LLC. (Kim, Kevin)
July 19, 2021 Filing 18 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant E. I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, identifying Corteva, Inc.. (Mortl, Andrew)
July 19, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin Keevin Kim counsel for Defendant Decra Roofing Systems, Inc.. Adding Kevin Kim as counsel of record for Decra Roofing Systems, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Decra Roofing Systems, Inc.. (Attorney Kevin Keevin Kim added to party Decra Roofing Systems, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kim, Kevin)
July 19, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Corteva, Inc., DuPont De Nemours, Inc., identifying DuPont de Nemours, Inc. and Corteva, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul)
July 19, 2021 Filing 15 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction FRCP Rule 12(b)(2)) filed by Defendants E. I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. Motion set for hearing on 11/22/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Andrew T. Mortl added to party E. I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew T. Mortl added to party The Chemours Company(pty:dft)) (Mortl, Andrew)
July 19, 2021 Filing 14 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under FRCP Rule 12(B)(2) filed by Defendants Corteva, Inc., DuPont De Nemours, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/22/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss under FRCO Rule 12(B(2)) (Attorney Paul D Murphy added to party Corteva, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul D Murphy added to party DuPont De Nemours, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Murphy, Paul)
July 16, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant 3M Company, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #11 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #12 , Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34), #9 served on July 16, 2021. (Queen, Daniel)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 9/13/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant 3M Company, re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #8 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 served on July 14, 2021. (Queen, Daniel)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-08897-SVW(ASx). Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:21-cv-01156-SVW(ASx). Signed by Judge Stephen V. Wilson (ap)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
July 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Corona Utility Authority, City of Corona, upon Defendant DuPont De Nemours, Inc. served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 4/1/2021 Submitted with Attachment 4 pg. 102 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Corona Utility Authority, City of Corona, upon Defendant Corteva, Inc. served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Barbara Lopes, The Corporation Company, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 4/1/2021 Submitted with Attachment 4 pg. 98 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants 3M Company, Corteva, Inc., Decra Roofing Systems, Inc., Doe Defendants 1-49, inclusive, DuPont De Nemours, Inc., E. I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Corona Utility Authority, City of Corona. Filed in State Court on 2/16/2021 Submitted with Attachment 4 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Corona Utility Authority, City of Corona, upon Defendant E. I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 4/1/2021 Submitted with Attachment 4 pg. 104 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Corona Utility Authority, City of Corona, upon Defendant Decra Roofing Systems, Inc. served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 4/1/2021 Submitted with Attachment 4 pg. 100 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Corona Utility Authority, City of Corona, upon Defendant The Chemours Company served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/26/2019 Submitted with Attachment 4 pg. 106 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Corona Utility Authority, City of Corona, upon Defendant 3M Company acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Daniel Queen, Counsel for Defendant. Filed in State Court on 6/3/2021 Submitted with Attachment 6 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 12, 2021 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants 3M Company, Corteva, Inc., Decra Roofing Systems, Inc., Doe Defendants, DuPont De Nemours, Inc., E. I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs Corona Utility Authority, City of Corona. Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on July 12, 2021. (Queen, Daniel)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant 3M Company. Related Case(s): 8:21-cv-01029-SVW-AS and 2:20-cv-08897-SVW-AS (Queen, Daniel)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant 3M Company, (Queen, Daniel)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Queen, Daniel)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVR12100800 Receipt No: ACACDC-31610149 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (First Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 (Part 1), #5 Exhibit 4 (Part 2), #6 Exhibit 4 (Part 3), #7 Exhibit 4 (Part 4)) (Attorney Daniel David Queen added to party 3M Company(pty:dft))(Queen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Corona et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Corona
Represented By: Andrew Walls Homer
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Represented By: Michael Willard Olson
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corona Utility Authority
Represented By: Andrew Walls Homer
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Represented By: Michael Willard Olson
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Daniel David Queen
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Represented By: Thomas J Boer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: Andrew T. Mortl
Represented By: Adam M Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: Andrew T. Mortl
Represented By: Adam M Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Represented By: Jodi M Newberry
Represented By: Paul D Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DuPont De Nemours, Inc.
Represented By: Jodi M Newberry
Represented By: Paul D Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decra Roofing Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Irene Le
Represented By: Kevin Keevin Kim
Represented By: Tala Toufanian Jayadevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?