Roger Wayne Parker v. County of Riverside et al
Plaintiff: Roger Wayne Parker
Defendant: County of Riverside, Paul E. Zellerback, Sean Lafferty, Tricia Fransdal, Jeff Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach and Jeffrey Van Wagenen
Case Number: 5:2021cv01280
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
2 Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order (1) GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 70); and (2) VACATING the 11/27/2023 Hearing by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: The Court ORDERS as follows: (1) Defendants' Motion #70 is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. (2) Counts One (malicious prosecution under Section 1983) and Three (Monell claim for malicious prosecution) are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. (3) Count Five (declaratory relief) is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. (4) Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint no later than 12/1/2023. (5) The Court VACATES the 11/27/2023 hearing. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
November 16, 2023 Filing 73 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The HEARING on the MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) #70 is CONTINUED from 11/20/2023 to 11/27/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 6, 2023 Filing 72 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) #70 filed by Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal, Sean Lafferty, Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Proposed Order)(McLaughlin, Abigail)
October 30, 2023 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) #70 filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. (Trimble, Kimberly)
October 20, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal(in her official capacity), Sean Lafferty(in his official capacity), Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach. Motion set for hearing on 11/20/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McLaughlin, Abigail)
September 29, 2023 Filing 69 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Trimble, Kimberly)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: REOPENING Case and GRANTING Leave to Amend. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint no later than September 29, 2023. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) (twdb)
September 18, 2023 Filing 67 BRIEF filed by defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal(in her official capacity), Sean Lafferty(in his official capacity), Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach. Brief re Defendants' Response to Ninth Circuit's Dicta Regarding a Potential Tatum-Lee Due Process Claim regarding USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order, #63 . (McLaughlin, Abigail)
September 13, 2023 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendant's Amended Proposed Order for Judgment on the Pleadings (Post-Appeal) filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. (Trimble, Kimberly)
September 6, 2023 Filing 65 MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #58 , CCA # 22-55614. The judgment of this Court, entered August 15, 2023, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Opinion #63 , REVERSED AND REMANDED.](mat)
September 6, 2023 Filing 64 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS #33 , Order on Motion to Certify #55 , USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order, #63 , Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #44 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Proposed Order Granting Judgment on the Pleadings)(Sain, Anthony)
August 15, 2023 Filing 63 OPINION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed Re USCA Order, #56 , Notice of Appeal #58 , CCA # 22-55614. The judgment of the District Court Because there was no judicial proceeding, Parker cannot show that he was prejudiced by any failure to disclose Brady evidence. REVERSED AND REMANDED. Each party to bear its own costs. [See Opinion for further information.] (car) Modified on 8/21/2023 (car).
May 19, 2023 Filing 62 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexander Seanon Rynerson counsel for Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal, Sean Lafferty, Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach. Alexander S. Rynerson is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants. (Rynerson, Alexander)
January 12, 2023 Filing 61 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexander Seanon Rynerson counsel for Defendant County of Riverside. Adding Alexander S. Rynerson as counsel of record for County of Riverside, Paul E. Zellerbach, Sean Lafrerty, Tricia Fransdal, and Jeff Van Wagenen for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Defendant. (Attorney Alexander Seanon Rynerson added to party County of Riverside(pty:dft))(Rynerson, Alexander)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND JOINT REQUEST OF PARTIES TO STAY FURTHER DISTRICT COURT PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL OF COURT'S ORDER PARTIALLY DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS #59 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. See order for further details. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
September 19, 2022 Filing 59 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Appeal of Court's Order Partially Denying Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant County of Riverside. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McLaughlin, Abigail)
June 30, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal(in her official capacity), Sean Lafferty(in his official capacity), Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach. Appeal of Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #44 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33556404.) (McLaughlin, Abigail)
June 23, 2022 Filing 57 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 22-55614 assigned to USCA Order, #56 . (mat)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed. CCA # 22-80041. The petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) is granted. Within 14 days after the date of this order, petitioners shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). (mat)
May 5, 2022 Filing 55 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) GRANTING Defendants Motion for Interlocutory Appeal (Dkt. No. 47); and (2) VACATING the May 9, 2022 Hearing #47 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
April 29, 2022 Filing 54 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The HEARING on the MOTION to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal #47 , is continued from 5/2/2022 to 5/9/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 22, 2022 Filing 53 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The HEARING on the MOTION to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal #47 , is continued from 4/25/2022 to 5/2/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 11, 2022 Filing 52 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal Order Partially Denying MJOP [DKT. 44] in Light of Public Interest in Resolution of Disputed Point of Law #47 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL ORDER PARTIALLY DENYING M.J.O.P.; NOTICE OF UNTIMELY AND IMPROPER OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF AND REQUEST TO STRIKE filed by Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal, Tricia Fransdal, Sean Lafferty, Sean Lafferty, Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach, Paul E. Zellerback. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abigail J. R. McLaughlin, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Abigail J. R. McLaughlin)(McLaughlin, Abigail)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROTECTIVE ORDER RE CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato re Stipulation for Protective Order #49 . [See document for further details.] (et)
April 7, 2022 Filing 50 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal Order Partially Denying MJOP [DKT. 44] in Light of Public Interest in Resolution of Disputed Point of Law #47 filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. (Trimble, Kimberly)
April 7, 2022 Filing 49 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal(in her official capacity), Tricia Fransdal(individually), Sean Lafferty(in his official capacity), Sean Lafferty(individually), Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach, Paul E. Zellerback. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order re Confidential Documents)(McLaughlin, Abigail)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re: Stipulated Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, re Stipulation for Protective Order #46 . The Court declines to approve the proposed Stipulated Protective Order (see document for further details). (hr)
March 28, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal Order Partially Denying MJOP [DKT. 44] in Light of Public Interest in Resolution of Disputed Point of Law filed by Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal(in her official capacity), Sean Lafferty(in his official capacity), Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach. Motion set for hearing on 4/25/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLaughlin, Abigail)
March 25, 2022 Filing 46 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal(in her official capacity), Tricia Fransdal(individually), Sean Lafferty(in his official capacity), Sean Lafferty(individually), Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach, Paul E. Zellerback. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order re Confidential Documents)(Attorney Abigail McLaughlin added to party County of Riverside(pty:dft), Attorney Abigail McLaughlin added to party Tricia Fransdal(pty:dft), Attorney Abigail McLaughlin added to party Tricia Fransdal(pty:dft), Attorney Abigail McLaughlin added to party Sean Lafferty(pty:dft), Attorney Abigail McLaughlin added to party Sean Lafferty(pty:dft), Attorney Abigail McLaughlin added to party Jeffrey Van Wagenen(pty:dft), Attorney Abigail McLaughlin added to party Paul E. Zellerbach(pty:dft), Attorney Abigail McLaughlin added to party Paul E. Zellerback(pty:dft))(McLaughlin, Abigail)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING Defendants' "Motion for Protective Order to Bar Re-Deposition of Certain Witnesses through Misuse of Process" by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: denying #36 Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiff may depose defendants Van Wagenen, Lafferty, and Zellerbach. (see document for further details) (hr)
February 23, 2022 Filing 44 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #33 Defendants' MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. No. 33); and VACATING THE 2/28/22 Hearing. Mr. Parker shallfile an Amended Complaint, if any, by March 4, 2022. (twdb)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, re: MOTION for Protective Order for to Bar Re-Deposition of Certain Witnesses Through Misuse of Process #36 . The Court finds the motion appropriate for decision without oral argument. Hence, the March 3, 2022 hearing is hereby VACATED, and the matter is taken under submission. (hr)
February 18, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION for Protective Order for to Bar Re-Deposition of Certain Witnesses Through Misuse of Process #36 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
February 17, 2022 Filing 41 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for to Bar Re-Deposition of Certain Witnesses Through Misuse of Process #36 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. (Trimble, Kimberly)
February 17, 2022 Filing 40 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for to Bar Re-Deposition of Certain Witnesses Through Misuse of Process #36 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Protective Order to Bar Re-Deposition of Certain Witnesses Through Misuse of Process filed by Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal, Tricia Fransdal, Sean Lafferty, Sean Lafferty, Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach, Paul E. Zellerback. (Sain, Anthony)
February 14, 2022 Filing 39 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS #33 REPLY OF DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS filed by Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal, Tricia Fransdal, Sean Lafferty, Sean Lafferty, Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach, Paul E. Zellerback. (Sain, Anthony)
February 7, 2022 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS #33 filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. (Trimble, Kimberly)
February 7, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Kimberly Sue Trimble counsel for Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. Changing firm name to Singleton Schreiber, LLP. Changing e-Mail to ktrimble@singletonschreiber.com. Filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. (Trimble, Kimberly)
February 7, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for to Bar Re-Deposition of Certain Witnesses Through Misuse of Process filed by Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal(in her official capacity), Tricia Fransdal(individually), Sean Lafferty(in his official capacity), Sean Lafferty(individually), Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach, Paul E. Zellerback. Motion set for hearing on 3/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation re Defendants' Motion for Protective Order to Bar Re-Deposition of Certain Witnesses Through Misuse of Process, #2 Exhibit A to Joint Stipulation, #3 Declaration of Tori Bakken, #4 Exhibit A to Tori Bakken Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Tori Bakken Declaration, #6 Exhibit C to Tori Bakken Declaration, #7 Exhibit D to Tori Bakken Declaration, #8 Exhibit E to Tori Bakken Declaration, #9 Exhibit F to Tori Bakken Declaration, #10 Declaration of Gerald Singleton)(Bakken, Tori)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 3/20/2023. (npo)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 3/4/2022. Discovery cut-off 2/13/2023. Motions cut-off 5/1/2023. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 3/20/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 6/27/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. See order for details. (npo)
January 19, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS filed by Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal(in her official capacity), Tricia Fransdal(individually), Sean Lafferty(in his official capacity), Sean Lafferty(individually), Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach, Paul E. Zellerback. Motion set for hearing on 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sain, Anthony)
December 21, 2021 Filing 32 The Court hereby vacates the Scheduling Conference set for 12/27/2021. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 13, 2021 Filing 31 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 court days, filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker.. (Trimble, Kimberly)
November 24, 2021 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony M Sain counsel for Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal, Tricia Fransdal, Sean Lafferty, Sean Lafferty, Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach, Paul E. Zellerback. Adding Tori L.N. Bakken as counsel of record for s COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE, PAUL E. ZELLERBACH, SEAN LAFFERTY, TRICIA FRANSDAL and JEFF VAN WAGENEN for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tori L.N. Bakken. (Sain, Anthony)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney #28 . Steven D. Manning and Eugene P. Ramirez of Manning and Kass terminated. (twdb)
November 9, 2021 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Substitute attorney Tony M. Sain in place of attorney Eugene P. Ramirez filed by defendant County of Riverside. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Sain, Anthony)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 12/27/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (npo)
October 5, 2021 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony M Sain counsel for Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal, Sean Lafferty, Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach. Adding Tony M. Sain as counsel of record for COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE; PAUL E. ZELLERBACH, SEAN LAFFERTY, TRICIA FRANSDAL, JEFF VAN WAGENEN for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants County of Riverside; Paul E. Zellerbach, Sean Lafferty, Tricia Fransdal, Jeff Van Wagenen. (Sain, Anthony)
September 9, 2021 Filing 25 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal(in her official capacity), Tricia Fransdal(individually), Sean Lafferty(in his official capacity), Sean Lafferty(individually), Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach, Paul E. Zellerback, identifying Roger Wayne Parker, Plaintiff; County of Riverside, Defendant; Paul E. Zellerbach, Defendant; Sean Lafferty, Defendant; Tricia Fransdal, Defendant; Jeff Van Wagenen, Defendant. (Attorney Tori Lyn Noelani Bakken added to party County of Riverside(pty:dft), Attorney Tori Lyn Noelani Bakken added to party Tricia Fransdal(pty:dft), Attorney Tori Lyn Noelani Bakken added to party Tricia Fransdal(pty:dft), Attorney Tori Lyn Noelani Bakken added to party Sean Lafferty(pty:dft), Attorney Tori Lyn Noelani Bakken added to party Sean Lafferty(pty:dft), Attorney Tori Lyn Noelani Bakken added to party Jeffrey Van Wagenen(pty:dft), Attorney Tori Lyn Noelani Bakken added to party Paul E. Zellerbach(pty:dft), Attorney Tori Lyn Noelani Bakken added to party Paul E. Zellerback(pty:dft))(Bakken, Tori)
September 8, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal(in her official capacity), Tricia Fransdal(individually), Sean Lafferty(in his official capacity), Sean Lafferty(individually), Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach, Paul E. Zellerback.(Attorney Eugene P Ramirez added to party County of Riverside(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene P Ramirez added to party Tricia Fransdal(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene P Ramirez added to party Tricia Fransdal(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene P Ramirez added to party Sean Lafferty(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene P Ramirez added to party Sean Lafferty(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene P Ramirez added to party Jeffrey Van Wagenen(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene P Ramirez added to party Paul E. Zellerbach(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene P Ramirez added to party Paul E. Zellerback(pty:dft))(Ramirez, Eugene)
August 31, 2021 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker, upon Defendant Tricia Fransdal(in her official capacity) served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe, Husband (Refused to give Name) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Singleton, Gerald)
August 31, 2021 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker, upon Defendant Paul E. Zellerbach served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul E. Zellerbach in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Singleton, Gerald)
August 31, 2021 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker, upon Defendant Sean Lafferty(in his official capacity) served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jonathan Clark, System Analyst in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Singleton, Gerald)
August 30, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #18 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
August 27, 2021 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker, upon Defendant Jeffrey Van Wagenen served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sue Maxwell, Deputy County Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Singleton, Gerald)
August 27, 2021 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker, upon Defendant County of Riverside served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sue Maxwell, Deputy County Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Singleton, Gerald)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #10 , #12 Non-Resident Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker, designating Gerald Blaine Singleton as local counsel. (et)
August 18, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kimberly Sue Trimble counsel for Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. Adding Kimberly S. Trimble as counsel of record for Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. (Attorney Kimberly Sue Trimble added to party Roger Wayne Parker(pty:pla))(Trimble, Kimberly)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
August 10, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:21-cv-01280 JGB(KKx). (rn)
August 9, 2021 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants County of Riverside, Tricia Fransdal(in her official capacity), Tricia Fransdal(individually), Sean Lafferty(in his official capacity), Sean Lafferty(individually), Jeffrey Van Wagenen, Paul E. Zellerbach, Paul E. Zellerback. (et)
August 9, 2021 Filing 12 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Wilbur O. Colom to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 8/4/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-31748699) filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Singleton, Gerald)
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Wilbur O. Colom to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 8/4/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-31748699) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): The attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must complete Section 1 of this Application, personally sign, in ink, the certification in Section II, and have the designated Local Counsel sign in Section III. ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES ARE NOT ACCEPTED. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Wilbur O. Colom to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 8/4/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-31748699) filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Singleton, Gerald)
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. (Singleton, Gerald)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Wilbur O Colom on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2021: #1 CV11-C Statement of Consent) (et).
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John C Lemon counsel for Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. Adding John C. Lemon as counsel of record for Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. (Attorney John C Lemon added to party Roger Wayne Parker(pty:pla))(Lemon, John)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. (Singleton, Gerald)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Roger Wayne Parker, (Singleton, Gerald)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. (Singleton, Gerald)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31717787 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Roger Wayne Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton added to party Roger Wayne Parker(pty:pla))(Singleton, Gerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roger Wayne Parker v. County of Riverside et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Wayne Parker
Represented By: Gerald Blaine Singleton
Represented By: John C. Lemon
Represented By: Kimberly Sue Trimble
Represented By: Wilbur O. Colom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Riverside
Represented By: Anthony M Sain
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Tori Lyn Noelani Bakken
Represented By: Anthony M. Sain
Represented By: Abigail McLaughlin
Represented By: Alexander Seanon Rynerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E. Zellerback
Represented By: Anthony M Sain
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Tori Lyn Noelani Bakken
Represented By: Anthony M. Sain
Represented By: Abigail McLaughlin
Represented By: Alexander Seanon Rynerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Lafferty
Represented By: Anthony M Sain
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Tori Lyn Noelani Bakken
Represented By: Anthony M. Sain
Represented By: Abigail McLaughlin
Represented By: Alexander Seanon Rynerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tricia Fransdal
Represented By: Anthony M Sain
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Tori Lyn Noelani Bakken
Represented By: Anthony M. Sain
Represented By: Abigail McLaughlin
Represented By: Alexander Seanon Rynerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Van Wagenen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E. Zellerbach
Represented By: Anthony M Sain
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Tori Lyn Noelani Bakken
Represented By: Anthony M. Sain
Represented By: Abigail McLaughlin
Represented By: Alexander Seanon Rynerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Van Wagenen
Represented By: Anthony M Sain
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Represented By: Tori Lyn Noelani Bakken
Represented By: Anthony M. Sain
Represented By: Abigail McLaughlin
Represented By: Alexander Seanon Rynerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?