Luis Flores v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Luis Flores
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2021cv01323
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has received Plaintiff's "Declaration of Aimee E. Kirby Regarding Ruling on Motion to Strike" (the "Declaration") [ECF No. 18], filed in case number 5:21-cv-00818-JWH-KKx. In view of the Declaration, the Court hereby sets a Status Conference on October 15, 2021, at 11:00 a.m., via video conference. To obtain the video conference link for the scheduled hearing, the parties are directed to Judge Holcomb's Procedures and Schedules page on the Court's website: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-w-holcomb. Please follow the instructions listed under "Zoom Webinar Hearings." IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant United States of America. Related Case(s): 5:21-cv-00818 (Firippis, Irene)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (ghap)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by attorney for plaintiff Luis Flores. (Kirby, Aimee)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Luis Flores, identifying United States of America. (Kirby, Aimee)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Luis Flores. (Kirby, Aimee)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31756713 - Fee: $402, filed by attorney for plaintiff Luis Flores. (Attorney Aimee Elizabeth Kirby added to party Luis Flores(pty:pla))(Kirby, Aimee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luis Flores v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Flores
Represented By: Aimee Elizabeth Kirby
Represented By: Christopher B Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?