Robert D. Matthews et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Mr Robert Matthews, --, Vicki Matthews and Dr. Robert D. Matthews
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2021cv01423
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge John W. Holcomb #18 . Based upon the stipulation of the parties and a showing of good cause, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: The government shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs complaint no later than December 28,2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
October 5, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 12/28/2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Attorney Robert F Conte added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Conte, Robert)
August 27, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Robert D. Matthews, Vicki Matthews, Complaint and Summons served on August 28, 2021. (Dayton, Gordon)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Robert D. Matthews, Vicki Matthews, served on August 26, 2021. (Dayton, Gordon)
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States of America (US Attorney Office). (yl)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (yl)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Gordon Dayton re Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #8 , Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form, #11 Gordon Dayton filed by Plaintiffs Robert D. Matthews, Vicki Matthews. (Dayton, Gordon)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #8 by Deputy Clerk of Court. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. Counsel shall file the Notice of Interested Parties no later than August 31, 2021. (iva)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Summons Request #9 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #7 filed by Plaintiff Robert D. Matthews, Vicki Matthews. (Dayton, Gordon)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #7 filed by Plaintiff Robert D. Matthews, Vicki Matthews. (Dayton, Gordon)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments Civil Cover Sheet and Summons are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #4 . Document # 4 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk docketed the Notice of Deficiencies with wrong filed dated for the Complaint. (ghap)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 8/23/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 4] NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments Civil Cover Sheet and Summons are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) Modified on 8/23/2021 (ghap).
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31848039 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Robert Matthews, Vicki Matthews. (Attorney Gordon Leigh Dayton added to party Robert Matthews(pty:pla), Attorney Gordon Leigh Dayton added to party Vicki Matthews(pty:pla))(Dayton, Gordon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert D. Matthews et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Robert Matthews, --
Represented By: Gordon Leigh Dayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Matthews
Represented By: Gordon Leigh Dayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Robert D. Matthews
Represented By: Gordon Leigh Dayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Robert F Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?