Richard R Lawless v. The Security & Exchange Commission
Plaintiff: Richard R Lawless
Defendant: The Security & Exchange Commission
Case Number: 5:2021cv01637
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant The Security & Exchange Commission. (yl)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
October 7, 2021 Filing 13 Text Only Entry - IN CHAMBERS by Judge John W. Holcomb: Notice Regarding Electronic Document Submission System for People Without Lawyers. People who are not represented by attorneys may now submit documents for filing through the Court's Electronic Document Submission System ("EDSS") instead of mailing or bringing documents to the Clerk's Office. EDSS is not the same as filing documents electronically in the Court's CM/ECF System. Registration is not required to use EDSS and you do not need a PACER account; only internet access and an e-mail address are required. Attorneys may not use EDSS to submit documents on behalf of their clients. To access EDSS and for additional information, visit the Court's website at https://apps.cacd.uscourts.gov/edss. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (kca)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Richard R Lawless, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Richard R Lawless, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Attorney General of of the United States Merrick B Garland. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Attorney General of OS. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Richard R Lawless, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Jerry Yang, Assistant US Attorney,. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Jerry Yang, AUSA,. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Richard R Lawless, upon Defendant The Security & Exchange Commission served on 9/27/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to John Coates, General Counsel SEC. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Richard R Lawless. (esa)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Richard R Lawless. (esa)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant The Security & Exchange Commission.Case assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym, filed by plaintiff Richard R Lawless. (Attachments: #1 CV 71) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard R Lawless v. The Security & Exchange Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard R Lawless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Security & Exchange Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?