Abel Rodriquez et al v. Gregory Funding, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Abel Rodriquez and Veronica R. Jara
Defendant: Gregory Funding, LLC, AJAX Mortgage Loan Trust 2019- F, Mortgage-Backed Securities, Series 2019-F, by U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee, Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder Weiss, LLP, DOES 1-10, inclusive and AJAX Mortgage Loan Trust 2019- F
Case Number: 5:2021cv01703
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 14 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The HEARING on the MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #9 is CONTINUED from 12/6/2021 to 12/13/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 29, 2021 Filing 13 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The HEARING on the MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #9 is CONTINUED from 11/29/2021 to 12/6/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 18, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #9 filed by Defendants AJAX Mortgage Loan Trust 2019- F, Gregory Funding, LLC. (Stoltzman, Michael)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #9 filed by Plaintiffs Veronica R. Jara, Abel Rodriquez. (Cara, Anthony)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #9 filed by Defendants AJAX Mortgage Loan Trust 2019- F, Gregory Funding, LLC. (Stoltzman, Michael)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by defendant AJAX Mortgage Loan Trust 2019- F, Gregory Funding, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/29/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Stoltzman, Michael)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants AJAX Mortgage Loan Trust 2019- F, Gregory Funding, LLC, identifying Gregory Funding, LLC and Ajax Mortgage. (Stoltzman, Michael)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
October 7, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants AJAX Mortgage Loan Trust 2019- F, Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder Weiss, LLP, Does 1-10, inclusive, Gregory Funding, LLC., filed by plaintiffs Abel Rodriquez, Veronica R. Jara. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/23/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants AJAX Mortgage Loan Trust 2019- F, Mortgage-Backed Securities, Series 2019-F, by U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee, Gregory Funding, LLC. (Stoltzman, Michael)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVPS2104395 Receipt No: ACACDC-32114633 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant AJAX Mortgage Loan Trust 2019- F, Mortgage-Backed Securities, Series 2019-F, by U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee, Gregory Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Summons, #3 State Civil Case Cover Sheet) (Attorney Michael W Stoltzman, Jr added to party AJAX Mortgage Loan Trust 2019- F, Mortgage-Backed Securities, Series 2019-F, by U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee(pty:dft), Attorney Michael W Stoltzman, Jr added to party Gregory Funding, LLC(pty:dft))(Stoltzman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abel Rodriquez et al v. Gregory Funding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Rodriquez
Represented By: Anthony Paul Cara
Represented By: Peter L Nisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica R. Jara
Represented By: Anthony Paul Cara
Represented By: Peter L Nisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Funding, LLC
Represented By: Michael W Stoltzman, Jr
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Represented By: Timothy M Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJAX Mortgage Loan Trust 2019- F, Mortgage-Backed Securities, Series 2019-F, by U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee
Represented By: Michael W Stoltzman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder Weiss, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJAX Mortgage Loan Trust 2019- F
Represented By: Michael W Stoltzman, Jr
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Represented By: Timothy M Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?