Irvin L. Houston v. Loma Linda Veterans Hospital Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Irvin L Houston and Irvin L. Houston
Defendant: Loma Linda Veterans Hospital Medical Center, Jorge Rivera, M.D., Allison J Avila, M.D., Josephine Vance, M.D. and DOES 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2021cv01713
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Irvin L. Houston. The dismissal was served served on 11/30/2021. (yl)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court finds that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ECF Nos. 6 & 7] are appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set on December 3, 2021. The motions stand submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a) or (c)of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Irvin L. Houston. (yl)
November 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS filed by defendant Loma Linda Veterans Hospital Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Finn, Kevin)
October 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
October 24, 2021 Filing 10 Text Only Entry - IN CHAMBERS by Judge John W. Holcomb: Notice Regarding Electronic Document Submission System for People Without Lawyers. People who are not represented by attorneys may now submit documents for filing through the Court's Electronic Document Submission System ("EDSS") instead of mailing or bringing documents to the Clerk's Office. EDSS is not the same as filing documents electronically in the Court's CM/ECF System. Registration is not required to use EDSS and you do not need a PACER account; only internet access and an e-mail address are required. Attorneys may not use EDSS to submit documents on behalf of their clients. To access EDSS and for additional information, visit the Court's website at https://apps.cacd.uscourts.gov/edss. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of address Changing attorneys address to 1757 Las Colinas Road, Beaumont CA 92223. Filed by Plaintiff Irvin L. Houston. (yl)
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF KEVIN B. FINN filed by Defendant Loma Linda Veterans Hospital Medical Center. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Finn, Kevin)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF KEVIN B. FINN filed by Defendant Loma Linda Veterans Hospital Medical Center. Motion set for hearing on 12/3/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Finn, Kevin)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
October 8, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Allison J Avila, M.D., Does 1-50, inclusive, Loma Linda Veterans Hospital Medical Center, Jorge Rivera, M.D., Josephine Vance, M.D. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Irvin L. Houston. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/18/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Loma Linda Veterans Hospital Medical Center. (Finn, Kevin)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of California for the County of San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2026976 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendant Loma Linda Veterans Hospital Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proof of Service) (Attorney Kevin Bruce Finn added to party Loma Linda Veterans Hospital Medical Center(pty:dft))(Finn, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irvin L. Houston v. Loma Linda Veterans Hospital Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irvin L Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irvin L. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loma Linda Veterans Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Kevin Bruce Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Rivera, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison J Avila, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine Vance, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?