William Henriquez v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Henriquez
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2021cv01820
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 26(F) REPORT of Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Shihabi, Mohammad)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Shashi H. Kewalramani. New Case Number 5:21-cv-01820 JWH (SHKx). (lh)
October 26, 2021 NON-CONFORMED ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 26, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Walmart, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff William Henriquez. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/18/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Higham, Terry)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc., (Higham, Terry)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Higham, Terry)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVSB2124117 Receipt No: ACACDC-32217431 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Terry L. Higham, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Answer) (Attorney Terry L Higham added to party Walmart, Inc.(pty:dft))(Higham, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Henriquez v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Henriquez
Represented By: Brandon J Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Terry L Higham
Represented By: Mohammad B Shihabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?