David Dicorato v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: David Dicorato
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv01867
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Filing 17 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff David Dicorato. (Herrera, Betty)
December 30, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Lynn M Harada added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Harada, Lynn)
December 9, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff David Dicorato, served on 12/09/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Herrera, Betty)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (see document for details) (Attachments: #1 Blank Consent Form) (hr)
December 3, 2021 Filing 13 60 DAY Summons Issued [Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Social Security Administration] re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (hr)
December 3, 2021 Filing 12 60 DAY Summons Issued [United States Attorney's Office] re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (hr)
December 3, 2021 Filing 11 60 DAY Summons Issued [Office of the Attorney General of the United States] re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (hr)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: granting #9 MOTION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
December 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff David Dicorato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Herrera, Betty)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #7 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by November 30, 2021. The correct form, CV-60, is attached here. (Attachments: #1 Blank CV-60 Form) (hr)
November 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect form used. Counsel is directed to re-file the request using the correct form, CV-60, which is attached here. (Attachments: #1 IFP Request Form) (clee)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff David Dicorato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Herrera, Betty)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff David Dicorato, identifying Betty Herrera. (Herrera, Betty)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff David Dicorato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Herrera, Betty)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff David Dicorato. (Herrera, Betty)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff David Dicorato. (Attorney Betty Herrera added to party David Dicorato(pty:pla))(Herrera, Betty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Dicorato v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dicorato
Represented By: Betty Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Lynn M Harada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?