Heather Featherstone v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Heather Featherstone
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv01869
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV21-1869 KES on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
December 3, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Heather Featherstone. (Herrera, Betty)
December 3, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Heather Featherstone, served on 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Herrera, Betty)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott, The Court has issued its Order Re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal. The parties are further ordered to comply with the following additional procedures. re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #9 [See document for details.] (es)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL(JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . [See document for details.] (es)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Summons.Civil Process Clerk, #2 Office of Regional Chief Counsel)(es)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. Granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (es)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Heather Featherstone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Herrera, Betty)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Heather Featherstone, identifying Betty Herrera. (Herrera, Betty)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Heather Featherstone. (Herrera, Betty)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Heather Featherstone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Herrera, Betty)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Heather Featherstone. (Attorney Betty Herrera added to party Heather Featherstone(pty:pla))(Herrera, Betty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heather Featherstone v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Featherstone
Represented By: Betty Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?