John Anthony Ovalle v. Kilolo Kijakazi Security
Plaintiff: John Anthony Ovalle
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv01900
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV21-1900 AFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Jennifer A. Kenney added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Kenney, Jennifer)
December 2, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff John Anthony Ovalle. (Rosales, Steven)
December 2, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Anthony Ovalle, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 11/22/2021, answer due 2/22/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Office of Regional Counsel,. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rosales, Steven)
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (es)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL(Joint Stipulation) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 .[See document for details.] (es)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. Granting #3 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (es)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff John Anthony Ovalle, (Rosales, Steven)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff John Anthony Ovalle. (Rosales, Steven)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff John Anthony Ovalle. (Rosales, Steven)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff John Anthony Ovalle. (Rosales, Steven)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff John Anthony Ovalle. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party John Anthony Ovalle(pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Anthony Ovalle v. Kilolo Kijakazi Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Anthony Ovalle
Represented By: Steven G Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Jennifer A. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?