Quintin Quashund Howard v. Riverside County Sheriff Department et al
Plaintiff: Quintin Quashund Howard
Defendant: Riverside County Sheriff Department, Victim Deputy No 1 and Witness Sergeant No 1
Case Number: 5:2021cv02006
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: SCREENING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The amended complaint will be dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint by or before February 18. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915, the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the total filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $ must be paid within thirty (30) days of $8.00 the date this order is filed. Failure to remit the initial partial filing fee may result in dismissal of the case. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). (See Order for further details) re REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #2 (vm)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Riverside County Sheriff Department filed by plaintiff Quintin Quashund Howard. Amending Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 (vm)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Denying #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee, with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff may re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court, if submitted with the Certified Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED. IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Reasons: Frivolous, malicious, or fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. See document for further details. (gk)
December 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Quintin Quashund Howard. (car)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, filed by Plaintiff Quintin Quashund Howard. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintin Quashund Howard v. Riverside County Sheriff Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quintin Quashund Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victim Deputy No 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Witness Sergeant No 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?