Brittania Nash v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Brittania Nash
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv02092
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Brittania Nash. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Brittania Nash. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Receipt of This Court's order of remand, etc. (yl)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Riverside County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Riverside County Superior Court. (yl)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND [ECF NO. 18] AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE [ECF NO. 19] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. In light of the foregoing, the Court hereby GRANTS Nashs Request for Judicial Notice of Exhibits AJ and Nashs Motion to Remand. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details). Case Remanded to Riverside County Superior Court, CVRI2103166. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (yl)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court finds the Motion to Remand #18 set for hearing on May 5, 2022, at 10:00 AM appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the motion hearing set for May 5, 2022, is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. No appearances are necessary of this date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Brittania Nash. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Brittania M. Nash for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Brittania M. Nash. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Riverside #18 filed by Plaintiff Brittania Nash. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Brittania Nash(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Motion to Remand In opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Riverside #18 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement Addendum - Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet filed by Plaintiff Brittania Nash re: Statement #16 . (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Riverside #18 filed by Plaintiff Brittania Nash. (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Riverside filed by Plaintiff Brittania Nash. Motion set for hearing on 5/5/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karin Kuemerle in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand) (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court ORDERS the parties to submit a current copy of the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet attached to the Court's Order Setting Scheduling Conference no later than fifteen (15) days after this ORDER. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference is available on Judge Frimpong's website. The Court will schedule Final Pretrial Conferences and Trials no earlier than August 2022. The parties are required to meet and confer regarding their availability prior to submitting this Joint worksheet. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement Pursuant to Reassignment Order filed by Plaintiff Brittania Nash (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, Please refer to the attached order for complete details. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kd)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-011) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, this case is transferred from Judge David O. Carter to the calendar of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:21-cv-02092-MEMF-KKx. (vp)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiff Brittania Nash (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Brittania Nash(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
January 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Brittania Nash. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Brittania Nash. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge David O. Carter. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:21-cv-02092 DOC (KKx). (jtil)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US LLC in Riverside Superior Court on 8/18/2021, attached as Exhibit D.(jtil)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Brittania Nash in Riverside Superior Court on 6/29/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #4 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on December 15, 2021. (Skanes, Mark)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Alejandro W. Blake as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Mark W. Skanes as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA North America Holdings LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.; Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.). (Skanes, Mark)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVRI2103166 Receipt No: ACACDC-32486804 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Skanes in Support of FCA US LLC's Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (Attorney Mark W Skanes added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Skanes, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brittania Nash v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittania Nash
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Mark W Skanes
Represented By: Alejandro Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?