Timothy Mazzola v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Timothy Mazzola
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv02109
Filed: December 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV21-2109 MAR on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 4, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Armand D Roth added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Roth, Armand)
January 3, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Timothy Mazzola. (Benavides, Francesco)
January 3, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Timothy Mazzola, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 12/27/2021, answer due 3/28/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Torres. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Eddie Anderson. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to No Data. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Benavides, Francesco)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. Plaintiff will promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days from the date service is completed. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. [See document for details.] (et)
December 22, 2021 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (et)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (et)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh)
December 18, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Timothy Mazzola. (Benavides, Francesco)
December 18, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Timothy Mazzola. (Benavides, Francesco)
December 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Timothy Mazzola, (Benavides, Francesco)
December 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Timothy Mazzola. (Benavides, Francesco)
December 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Timothy Mazzola. (Attorney Francesco P Benavides added to party Timothy Mazzola(pty:pla))(Benavides, Francesco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timothy Mazzola v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Mazzola
Represented By: Francesco P Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Armand D Roth
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?