Southern California Local 831 Employer Health Fund et al v. Premier Sign Services, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Southern California Local 831 Employer Health Fund, Southern California Local 831 Employer Pension Fund and California Tradeshow and Sign Crafts Joint Training Trust Fund of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 36
Defendant: Premier Sign Services Inc, Does 1-10 and Premier Sign Services, Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv02129
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court finds that Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration [ECF No. 15] is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set on March 11, 2022. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The hearing on Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration [ECF No. #15 ], is ordered CONTINUED from March 4, 2022, to March 11, 2022, at 9:00 a.m., via video conference. To obtain the video conference link for the scheduled hearing, the parties are directed to Judge Holcomb's Procedures and Schedules page on the Court's website: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-w-holcomb. Please follow the instructions listed under "Zoom Webinar Hearings." IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 25, 2022 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Premier Sign Services, Inc, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #15 served on February 3, 2022. (Bryson, Robert)
February 18, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Premier Sign Services, Inc. (Bryson, Robert)
February 11, 2022 Filing 16 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #15 filed by Plaintiffs California Tradeshow and Sign Crafts Joint Training Trust Fund of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 36, Southern California Local 831 Employer Health Fund, Southern California Local 831 Employer Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michele Sherer Ancheta, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ancheta, Michele)
January 28, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Premier Sign Services, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/4/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jessica Ascensio, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, #3 Declaration Declaration of Robert Bryson, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bryson, Robert)
January 28, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs California Tradeshow and Sign Crafts Joint Training Trust Fund of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 36, Southern California Local 831 Employer Health Fund, Southern California Local 831 Employer Pension Fund, re Generic Text Only Entry,, 10 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #11 served on 01/28/2022. (Ancheta, Michele)
January 28, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Southern California Local 831 Employer Health Fund, California Tradeshow and Sign Crafts Joint Training Trust Fund of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 36, Southern California Local 831 Employer Pension Fund, upon Defendant Premier Sign Services, Inc served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Arriaga, Owner, authorized person to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ancheta, Michele)
January 27, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Thomas Bryson, II counsel for Defendant Premier Sign Services, Inc. Adding Robert Thomas Bryson II as counsel of record for Premier Sign Services, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Premier Sign Services, Inc.. (Attorney Robert Thomas Bryson, II added to party Premier Sign Services, Inc (pty:dft))(Bryson, Robert)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John W. Holcomb, United States District Judge. Judge Holcomb is located in Courtroom 2, on the 2nd Floor of the George E. Brown, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, California 92501. Additional information regarding Judge Holcomb's procedures and schedules is available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:21-cv-02129 JWH(SPx). (rn)
December 28, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Premier Sign Services, Inc. (lh)
December 28, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
December 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs California Tradeshow and Sign Crafts Joint Training Trust Fund of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 36, Southern California Local 831 Employer Health Fund, Southern California Local 831 Employer Pension Fund, (Ancheta, Michele)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs California Tradeshow and Sign Crafts Joint Training Trust Fund of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 36, Southern California Local 831 Employer Health Fund, Southern California Local 831 Employer Pension Fund. (Ancheta, Michele)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs California Tradeshow and Sign Crafts Joint Training Trust Fund of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 36, Southern California Local 831 Employer Health Fund, Southern California Local 831 Employer Pension Fund. (Ancheta, Michele)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32521550 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Southern California Local 831 Employer Health Fund, California Tradeshow and Sign Crafts Joint Training Trust Fund of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 36, Southern California Local 831 Employer Pension Fund. (Attorney Michele S Ancheta added to party California Tradeshow and Sign Crafts Joint Training Trust Fund of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 36(pty:pla), Attorney Michele S Ancheta added to party Southern California Local 831 Employer Health Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Michele S Ancheta added to party Southern California Local 831 Employer Pension Fund(pty:pla))(Ancheta, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern California Local 831 Employer Health Fund et al v. Premier Sign Services, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California Local 831 Employer Health Fund
Represented By: Michele S Ancheta
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California Local 831 Employer Pension Fund
Represented By: Michele S Ancheta
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Tradeshow and Sign Crafts Joint Training Trust Fund of Painters and Allied Trades District Council 36
Represented By: Michele S Ancheta
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Sign Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Sign Services, Inc
Represented By: Robert Thomas Bryson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?