Pablo Cruz Cuevas v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Pablo Cruz Cuevas
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv02177
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV21-2177 SHK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 25, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Tina Naicker added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Naicker, Tina)
January 21, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Pablo Cruz Cuevas. (Shapiro, Brian)
January 21, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Pablo Cruz Cuevas, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 1/13/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Office of Regional Counsel,. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Shapiro, Brian)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE (In Chambers): CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (see document for details) (hr)
January 5, 2022 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (hr)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (et)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pablo Cruz Cuevas, (Shapiro, Brian)
December 30, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pablo Cruz Cuevas. (Shapiro, Brian)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Pablo Cruz Cuevas. (Shapiro, Brian)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Pablo Cruz Cuevas. (Shapiro, Brian)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Pablo Cruz Cuevas. (Attorney Brian C Shapiro added to party Pablo Cruz Cuevas(pty:pla))(Shapiro, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pablo Cruz Cuevas v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Cruz Cuevas
Represented By: Brian C Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?