Laura E. Claypool v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Laura E. Claypool
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 5:2021cv02178
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV21-2178 KES on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
February 10, 2022 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Laura E. Claypool, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Warren, Jessica)
February 10, 2022 Filing 19 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by plaintiff Laura E. Claypool. (Warren, Jessica)
February 9, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #17 re: Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge #15 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents #16 re Service of Summons and Complaint #14 by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. The documents are stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected documents by 02/11/2022. (jdo)
February 8, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) - Non-Final #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document submitted in the wrong case. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sn)
February 8, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA,, #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
February 7, 2022 Filing 15 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by PLAINTIFF Laura E. Claypool. (Warren, Jessica)
February 7, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Laura E. Claypool, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 1/26/2022, answer due 4/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. VELOZ. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to CLERK. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to CIVIL PROCESS CLERK. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Warren, Jessica)
January 25, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Jennifer A. Kenney added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Kenney, Jennifer)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. [See order for details.] (es)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL(JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . [See order for details.] (es)
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (es)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. Granting #7 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (es)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Laura E. Claypool. (Warren, Jessica)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Laura E. Claypool, (Warren, Jessica)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #4 filed by plaintiff Laura E. Claypool. (Warren, Jessica)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Laura E. Claypool. (Warren, Jessica)
December 31, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (et)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Warren, Jessica)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Jessica Elizabeth Warren added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Warren, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laura E. Claypool v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura E. Claypool
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Warren
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Jennifer A. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?