Alejandra Alvizo et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alejandra Alvizo and Laura Alvizo
Defendant: FCA US LLC, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,, Crystal Chrysler Jeep Dodge Center and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv00264
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Filing 44 JUDGMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #43 REQUEST for Judgment in favor of Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo against FCA US LLC: Pursuant to the Offer of Judgment, and the Acceptance of Offer of Judgment, filed on August 25, 2022, judgment is entered for plaintiffs ALEJANDRA ALVIZO and LAURA ALVIZO, and against defendant FCA US LLC, pursuant to the conditions set for in the Offer of Judgment. Related to: REQUEST for Judgment #43 (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (bm)
August 25, 2022 Filing 43 REQUEST for Judgment filed by Plaintiff Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 28, 2022 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo and Laura Alvizo. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 26, 2022 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. Kareem Shereef Aref is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo and Laura Alvizo. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 11, 2022 Filing 40 MINUTES OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; #30 MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO DEFENDANTS ARBITRATION PROGRAM filed by Plaintiffs; #31 MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO ATTORNEYS FEES filed by Plaintiffs; #32 MOTION IN LIMINE (6) to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO ATTORNEY MARKETING OR ADVERTISING filed by Plaintiffs; and #33 MOTION IN LIMINE (7) to Exclude DEFENDANT'S UNTIMELY DISCLOSED EXPERT AND EXPERT REPORT filed by Plaintiffs held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court is advised that the case is settled. The parties are granted forty-five days, up to and including August 25, 2022 to finalize the settlement and file a stipulation for dismissal. Court Reporter: Judy Moore. (aco)
July 11, 2022 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christine J Haw counsel for Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. Adding Christine Haw as counsel of record for Alejandra Alvizo and Laura Alvizo for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo and Laura Alvizo. (Haw, Christine)
July 8, 2022 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. Adding Oliver D. Tomas as counsel of record for Alejandra Alvizo and Laura Alvizo for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Alejandra Alvizo and Laura Alvizo. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 7, 2022 Filing 37 SCHEDULING NOTICE: The Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for 07/11/2022 at 3:00 p.m. has been rescheduled to 7/11/2022 at 1:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 7, 2022 Filing 36 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo.. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 7, 2022 Filing 35 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 6, 2022 Filing 34 Amendment to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS #29 filed by Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. (Pardo, Matthew)
July 6, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude DEFENDANT'S UNTIMELY DISCLOSED EXPERT AND EXPERT REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANT'S UNTIMELY DISCLOSED EXPERT AND EXPERT REPORT)(Pardo, Matthew)
July 6, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#6) to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO ATTORNEY MARKETING OR ADVERTISING filed by Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE: MOTION IN LIMINE #6 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO ATTORNEY MARKETING OR ADVERTISING)(Pardo, Matthew)
July 6, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO ATTORNEYS FEES filed by Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE: MOTION IN LIMINE #4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO ATTORNEYS FEES)(Pardo, Matthew)
July 6, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO DEFENDANTS ARBITRATION PROGRAM filed by Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RE: MOTION IN LIMINE #3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REFERRING TO DEFENDANTS ARBITRATION PROGRAM)(Pardo, Matthew)
July 6, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS filed by Plaintiff Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF MATTHEW PARDO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE, #2 Proposed Order ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO 1: TO EXCLUDE SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS)(Pardo, Matthew)
July 6, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Final Pre-Trial Conference Order, #2 Declaration of Christine Haw in Support of Plaintiffs' Proposed Final Pre-Trial Conference Order)(Haw, Christine)
June 24, 2022 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. Jaleceia VaShayla White is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Alejandra Alvizo. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 24, 2022 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. KARIN KUEMERLE is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Alejandra Alvizo. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 23, 2022 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance of Counsel Ariel Harman-Holmes (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
June 23, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tionna Dolin on behalf of Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo (Dolin, Tionna)
June 22, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nejla Nassirian on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Nejla Nassirian added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Nassirian, Nejla)
June 22, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
June 21, 2022 Filing 21 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo.. (Aref, Kareem)
June 21, 2022 Filing 20 PROPOSED Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo.. (Aref, Kareem)
June 21, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kareem Shereef Aref counsel for Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. Adding Kareem Aref as counsel of record for Alejandra Alvizo and Laura Alvizo for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo and Laura Alvizo. (Attorney Kareem Shereef Aref added to party Alejandra Alvizo(pty:pla), Attorney Kareem Shereef Aref added to party Laura Alvizo(pty:pla))(Aref, Kareem)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTIUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Request to substitute Spencer P. Hugret as attorney of record is hereby GRANTED.; granting #17 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Spencer Peter Hugret for FCA US LLC. Attorneys Aris Michele Allyn Shatteen and Brian Takeya Yasuzawa terminated. (aco)
June 3, 2022 Filing 17 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Spencer P. Hugret in place of attorney Brian Yasuzawa, Aris Shatteen filed by Defendat FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Brian Takeya Yasuzawa added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft)) (Yasuzawa, Brian)
April 19, 2022 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo counsel for Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. Adding Matthew Pardo as counsel of record for Alejandra Alvizo and Laura Alvizo for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo and Laura Alvizo. (Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Alejandra Alvizo(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Laura Alvizo(pty:pla))(Pardo, Matthew)
April 19, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christine J Haw counsel for Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. Adding Christine Haw as counsel of record for Alejandra Alvizo and Laura Alvizo for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo and Laura Alvizo. (Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Alejandra Alvizo(pty:pla), Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Laura Alvizo(pty:pla))(Haw, Christine)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING NOTICE-IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The initial status conference previously scheduled for 03/14/2022 at 3:00 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. A jury trial is set for 07/19/2022 at 9:00 a.m., with a pretrial conference on 07/11/2022 at 3:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 4, 2022 Filing 12 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo, identifying Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo, and Strategic Legal Practices, APC. (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 4, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karin Kuemerle counsel for Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. Adding Karin Kuemerle as counsel of record for Alejandra Alvizo and Laura Alvizo for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo and Laura Alvizo. (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Alejandra Alvizo(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Laura Alvizo(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 3/14/2022 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
February 11, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
February 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:22-cv-00264 SVW (KKx). (ghap)
February 10, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Crystal Chrysler Jeep Dodge Center, Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/2/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
February 10, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/15/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT D) (ghap)
February 10, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Crystal Chrysler Jeep Dodge Center. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/15/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT D)(ghap)
February 10, 2022 NON CONFORM COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to Crystal Chrysler Jeep Dodge Center without prejudice filed by plaintiffs Alejandra Alvizo, Laura Alvizo. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT F) (ghap)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 2/10/22. (Skanes, Mark)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA North America Holdings, LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.; Stellantis N.V.. (Skanes, Mark)
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Mark W. Skanes as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVPS2104661 Receipt No: ACACDC-32767177 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Skanes, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J) (Attorney Mark W Skanes added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Skanes, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alejandra Alvizo et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandra Alvizo
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Jaleceia VaShayla White
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Oliver De Castro Tomas
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Kareem Shereef Aref
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Alvizo
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Jaleceia VaShayla White
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Oliver De Castro Tomas
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Kareem Shereef Aref
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Mark W Skanes
Represented By: Michael J Gregg
Represented By: Aris Michele Allyn Shatteen
Represented By: Nejla Nassirian
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Brian Takeya Yasuzawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Chrysler Jeep Dodge Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?