Emily Alerich et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Emily Alerich and Christopher Alerich
Defendant: FCA US LLC and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv00303
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2023 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Emily Alerich. Ariel Harman-Holmes is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Emily Alerich. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 28, 2023 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gurpreet Sandhu counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Gurpreet Sandhu is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Sandhu, Gurpreet)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court hereby APPROVES the Stipulation #31 . The pretrial and trial dates and deadlines are continued. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2023 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 1/16/2024 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for further details. (gk)
July 5, 2023 Filing 31 First STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date and Related Dates filed by plaintiff Christopher Alerich, Emily Alerich. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. LaRocque in Support of Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Related Dates, #2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Related Parties)(Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Christopher Alerich(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
June 27, 2023 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Emily Alerich. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Emily Alerich for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Emily Alerich. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Emily Alerich(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
May 9, 2023 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nino Sanaia counsel for Plaintiffs Christopher Alerich, Emily Alerich. Adding Nino Sanaia as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Emily Alerich and Christopher Alerich. (Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Christopher Alerich(pty:pla), Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Emily Alerich(pty:pla))(Sanaia, Nino)
July 28, 2022 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Christopher Alerich, Emily Alerich. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Emily Alerich and Christopher Alerich. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 8/22/2023. Joint status report re settlement due by 8/29/2023. (gk)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2023 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 10/17/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for further details. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates) (gk)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on May 20, 2022. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 6, 2022 Filing 24 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Alerich, Emily Alerich.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
May 6, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Lambert, Sarah)
April 19, 2022 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Christopher Alerich, Emily Alerich. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Emily Alerich and Christopher Alerich for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs' Emily Alerich and Christopher Alerich. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Christopher Alerich(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Emily Alerich(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 7, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA NORTHA MERICA HOLDINGS LLC, FCA HOLDCO B.V.; STELLANTIS N.V. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sandhu, Gurpreet)
April 6, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
April 5, 2022 Filing 19 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/6/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2022 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
April 4, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sandhu, Gurpreet)
April 4, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gurpreet Sandhu on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Gurpreet Sandhu added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Sandhu, Gurpreet)
April 4, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric D Sentlinger on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Eric D Sentlinger added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Sentlinger, Eric)
April 4, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
March 18, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Emily Alerich, Christopher Alerich, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 18, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Alerich, Emily Alerich. correcting Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA,, #12 (Dolin, Tionna)
March 18, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Emily Alerich, Christopher Alerich, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 10, 2022 Filing 11 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christopher Alerich, Emily Alerich, identifying Emily Alerich, Christopher Alerich, Strategic Legal Practices, APC and Any Persons or Entities as Disclosed by FCA US, LLC. (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 10, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karin Kuemerle counsel for Plaintiffs Christopher Alerich, Emily Alerich. Adding Karin Kuemerle as counsel of record for Emily Alerich and Christopher Alerich for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Emily Alerich and Christopher Alerich. (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Christopher Alerich(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Emily Alerich(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
February 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
February 18, 2022 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant FCA US LLC. (ghap)
February 18, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
February 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
February 17, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs' Christopher Alerich, Emily Alerich. (Dolin, Tionna)
February 17, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Alerich, Emily Alerich. (Dolin, Tionna)
February 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32812328 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs' Emily Alerich, Christopher Alerich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015 Jeep Cherokee Express Warranty) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Christopher Alerich(pty:pla), Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Emily Alerich(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emily Alerich et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Alerich
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Alerich
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Eric D Sentlinger
Represented By: Gurpreet Sandhu
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?