Paul Yong Kim v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Paul Yong Kim
Defendant: United State of America
Case Number: 5:2022cv00691
Filed: April 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Filing 10 60-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant United State of America. (gk)
May 2, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Paul Yong Kim. (Glaser, Guy)
May 2, 2022 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Paul Yong Kim. (Glaser, Guy)
April 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
April 25, 2022 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
April 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 25, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil)
April 22, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Paul Yong Kim. Notice of Interested Parties (Glaser, Guy)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33175430 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Paul Yong Kim. (Attorney Guy Hyman Glaser added to party Paul Yong Kim(pty:pla))(Glaser, Guy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Yong Kim v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Yong Kim
Represented By: Guy Hyman Glaser
Represented By: Dennis N Brager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United State of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?