Danny McDowell v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Danny McDowell
Defendant: Walmart Inc., Stephanie Whitworth Chapman and Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv00897
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND #12 (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. The Court ORDERS as follows: 1. The Motion is DENIED. 2. Chapman is DISMISSED from this action. 3. The August 1, 2022 hearing is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
July 20, 2022 Filing 18 DECLARATION of John M. Beemer in Support of Request for Remote Appearance at August 1, 2022 Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peters, Theodore)
July 19, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY in support of Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Danny McDowell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Younglove, Douglas)
July 18, 2022 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Douglas S. Younglove Request for Remote Appearance filed by Plaintiff Danny McDowell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order in Support)(Younglove, Douglas)
July 12, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #12 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John M. Beemer, #2 Proposed Order)(Peters, Theodore)
July 6, 2022 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Theodore C. Peters In Support of Request for Remote Appearance at August 29, 2022 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peters, Theodore)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (tc)
June 29, 2022 Filing 12 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Danny McDowell. Motion set for hearing on 8/1/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support, #2 Proposed Order to Motion, #3 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 - Answer, #5 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit 4 - J.P., #7 Exhibit 5 - Email M&C, #8 Exhibit 6 - POS to Defendant) (Attorney Douglas Younglove added to party Danny McDowell(pty:pla)) (Younglove, Douglas)
June 29, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryne W Osborne counsel for Plaintiff Danny McDowell. Adding Douglas S. Younglove as counsel of record for Plaintiff, Danny McDowell for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Danny McDowell. (Osborne, Ryne)
June 29, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryne W Osborne counsel for Plaintiff Danny McDowell. Michael Domingo is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Danny McDowell. (Attorney Ryne W Osborne added to party Danny McDowell(pty:pla))(Osborne, Ryne)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Peters, Theodore)
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Theodore C Peters counsel for Defendant Walmart Inc.. Adding John M. Beemer as counsel of record for Walmart Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Peters, Theodore)
June 1, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
June 1, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
June 1, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (sh)
May 31, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Stephanie Whitworth Chapman, Does, Walmart Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Danny McDowell.[FILED IN STATE COURT 03/18/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
May 31, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc., identifying Danny McDowell, Stephanie Whitworth Chapman. (Peters, Theodore)
May 31, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Peters, Theodore)
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of California, Riverside Superior Court, case number CVSW2201816 Receipt No: ACACDC-33387970 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Attorney Theodore C Peters added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Peters, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danny McDowell v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny McDowell
Represented By: Douglas Younglove
Represented By: Michael Domingo
Represented By: Ryne W Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Theodore C Peters
Represented By: John M. Beemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Whitworth Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?