Sanjuanita Rodriguez v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: SANJUANITA RODRIGUEZ
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY, Sunland Ford, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv01056
Filed: June 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Craig A Taggart counsel for Defendant Ford Motor Company. Patricia H. Jun is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Taggart, Craig)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Campbell counsel for Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez. Adding Christopher Campbell as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez. (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Sanjuanita Rodriguez(pty:pla))(Campbell, Christopher)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #33 filed by defendant Ford Motor Company.(Jun, Patricia)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Ford Motor Company amending Amended Complaint/Petition #26 , filed by Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline SAC)(Law, Daniel)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND [Dkt. 27], by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Defendants motion to dismiss and strike is GRANTED. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend her complaint except with respect to her sixth cause of action, which is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file her amended complaint on or before August 18, 2023. Plaintiff is further ORDERED to file a redlined copy, reflecting all changes to the current complaint, as an exhibit to her amended complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Sanjuanita Rodriguez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Sanjuanita Rodriguez(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court finds that the Motion to Dismiss/Motion to Strike [Dkt. 27] is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set on July 28, 2023. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THIRD, FIFTH, AND SIXTH CLAIMS IN THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #27 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Jun, Patricia)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THIRD, FIFTH, AND SIXTH CLAIMS IN THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #27 filed by Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez. (Law, Daniel)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THIRD, FIFTH, AND SIXTH CLAIMS IN THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Motion set for hearing on 7/28/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patricia H. Jun, #2 Proposed Order) (Jun, Patricia)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Ford Motor Company amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (warranty))(Law, Daniel)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #24 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Plaintiff is to file the First Amended Complaint within five (5) court days of the granting of this Order. Plaintiff is also DIRECTED to file contemporaneously therewith a Notice of Lodging to the amended complaint that provides the Court with a redline version that shows the amendments. (lom)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to Amend for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Law, Daniel)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES[Dkt. 22] by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: The Court, having considered the Stipulation to Amend the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates and finding good cause, hereby GRANTS the Stipulation to Amend the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates. The new deadlines are set forth in the Scheduling Order chart filed with this Order. All deadlines established by the prior Civil Trial Order [Dkt. #19] are hereby VACATED. Discovery cut-off 9/15/2023., Exhibit List due by 1/19/2024., Witness List due by 1/19/2024., Motions in Limine to be filed by 1/5/2024., Last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/22/2023., Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2024 at 1:00 p.m., Jury Trial set for 3/4/2034 at 9:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Schedule of Pretrial Dates and Trial Dates Order,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #19 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patricia H. Jun, #2 Proposed Order)(Jun, Patricia)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael L Tracy counsel for Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez. Adding Michael Tracy as counsel of record for SANJUANITA RODRIGUEZ for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez. (Attorney Michael L Tracy added to party Sanjuanita Rodriguez(pty:pla))(Tracy, Michael)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than September 15, 2023. The parties shall file a joint report no later than seven (7) days after the ADR proceeding regarding the progress of settlement discussions. (shb)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TRIAL ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: The Scheduling Order governing this action is set forth in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates chart below. The box in the upper right-hand corner of the chart states whether the trial will be by jury or the Court. Amended Pleadings due by November 4, 2022., Discovery cut-off June 9, 2023., Exhibit List due by October 13, 2023., Witness List due by October 13, 2023., Motions in Limine to be filed by September 9, 2023., Last date to conduct settlement conference is September 15, 2023., Final Pretrial Conference set for November 17, 2023 at 1:00 p.m., Jury Trial set for December 4, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. Any request for continuance of trial must be filed no later than one (1) week prior to the Final Pretrial Conference. Requests extending dates set by the Court are not effective unless approved by the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND [Dkt. 9], by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Plaintiffs Motion to Remand is DENIED. This case will remain on this Courts calendar. The hearing on this Motion and the Scheduling Conference currently set for the same date have been vacated. [Dkt. 16, 17]. The Court will issue a Scheduling Order based upon the parties Rule 26(f) Report. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court finds that the Motion to Remand [Dkt. 9] is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set on September 23, 2022. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on September 23, 2022 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Bernardino #9 Supplemental filed by Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez. (Law, Daniel)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Bernardino #9 filed by Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Evidentiary Objection to Mortenson Declaration)(Law, Daniel)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Bernardino #9 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Mortenson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of M. Mortenson)(Mortenson, Michael)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Bernardino #9 filed by Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez. (Law, Daniel)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Bernardino filed by Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez. Motion set for hearing on 9/23/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand) (Law, Daniel)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Sanjuanita Rodriguez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Sanjuanita Rodriguez(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:21-cv-01056 SSS (MAAx). (lh)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Ford Motor Company, Sunland Ford, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/31/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/24/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Sanjuanita Rodriguez pursuant to Cal. Rules of Court, rules 3.760 and 3.770 as to Sunland Ford, Inc. (lh)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, (Mortenson, Michael)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Mortenson, Michael)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2125348 Receipt No: ACACDC-33535568 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Mortenson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #7 Exhibit 6 to Decl. of M. Mortenson) (Attorney Michael Donn Mortenson added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY (pty:dft))(Mortenson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanjuanita Rodriguez v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANJUANITA RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Michael L Tracy
Represented By: Michael Lion Tracy
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Represented By: Tionna Carvalho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Donn Mortenson
Represented By: Craig A Taggart
Represented By: Patricia H. Jun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunland Ford, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?