A.J. P. et al v. County of San Bernardino et al
Plaintiff: A. J. P., A. M. P. and Patricia Ruiz
Defendant: County of San Bernardino and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv01291
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant County of San Bernardino.(Attorney Eugene P Ramirez added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:dft))(Ramirez, Eugene)
August 29, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff A. J. P., Patricia Ruiz, A. M. P., upon Defendant County of San Bernardino served on 8/19/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessica Ruiz - Deputy Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Galipo, Dale)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: granting #5 APPLICATION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem, appointing Cynthia Nunez as Guardian ad Litem for A.J.P. and A.M.P. (hr)
July 25, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant County of San Bernardino. (ghap)
July 25, 2022 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
July 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
July 25, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error. The docket clerk failed to add the Magistrate Judge to assignment. The magistrate judge indicted now is Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
July 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to clerical error. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been reassigned to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. New Case Number 5:22-cv-1291-SSS. (ghap)
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Appointment of Cynthia Nunez as Guardian ad Litem for A.J.P. AND A.M.P. filed by Plaintiffs A. J. P., A. M. P., PATRICIA RUIZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration CONSENT OF NOMINEE CYNTHIA NUNEZ FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR PLAINTIFFS A.J.P. AND A.M.P. AS SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST TO ALBERT PEREZ, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA NUNEZ AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR PLAINTIFS A.J.P. AND A.M.P. AS SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST TO ALBERT PEREZ C.C.P. 377.32, #3 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF CYNTHIA NUNEZ FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR PLAINTIFFS A.J.P. AND A.M.P. AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ALBERT PEREZ) (Galipo, Dale)
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs A. J. P., A. M. P., PATRICIA RUIZ, identifying A.J.P. by and through her GAL Cynthia Nunez, A.M.P. by and through her GAL Cynthia Nunez, Patricia Ruiz, Albert Perez, and County of San Bernardino. (Galipo, Dale)
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs A. J. P., A. M. P., PATRICIA RUIZ. (Galipo, Dale)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs A. J. P., A. M. P., PATRICIA RUIZ. (Galipo, Dale)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (402.00 paid on 07/22/2022, receipt number 2865132), filed by Plaintiffs A. J. P., PATRICIA RUIZ, A. M. P.. (Attorney Dale K Galipo added to party A. J. P.(pty:pla), Attorney Dale K Galipo added to party A. M. P.(pty:pla), Attorney Dale K Galipo added to party PATRICIA RUIZ(pty:pla))(Galipo, Dale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.J. P. et al v. County of San Bernardino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. J. P.
Represented By: Dale K Galipo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M. P.
Represented By: Dale K Galipo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ruiz
Represented By: Dale K Galipo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Bernardino
Represented By: Garros Chan
Represented By: Lynn Louise Carpenter
Represented By: Eugene P Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?