McCracken v. KSF Acquisition Corporation
Plaintiff: Sarah McCracken
Defendant: KSF Acquisition Corporation
Case Number: 5:2022cv01666
Filed: September 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2022 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant KSF Acquisition Corporation amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Sarah McCracken(Schubert, Amber)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on December 2, 2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by November 22, 2022. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND JOINT REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S OPERATIVE COMPLAINT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation #14 is approved. Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint on or before 10/31/2022. The deadline for Defendant KSF Acquisition Corporation to respond to Plaintiff's operative complaint shall be extended to 11/21/2022. (gk)
October 13, 2022 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to KSF Acquisition Corporation answer now due 11/21/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant KSF Acquisition Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shackelford, Ricky)
October 13, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ricky L Shackelford counsel for Defendant KSF Acquisition Corporation. Adding Ricky L. Shackelford as counsel of record for KSF Acquisition Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant KSF Acquisition Corporation. (Attorney Ricky L Shackelford added to party KSF Acquisition Corporation(pty:dft))(Shackelford, Ricky)
September 29, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sarah McCracken, upon Defendant KSF Acquisition Corporation served on 9/26/2022, answer due 10/17/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporate Creations Network Inc. (Justine DOE), authorized to accept service on behalf of KSF Acquisition Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entitya.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schubert, Amber)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
September 23, 2022 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant KSF Acquisition Corporation. (et)
September 23, 2022 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
September 23, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 23, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (et)
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Amber L. Schubert Pursuant To California Civil Code Section 1780(d) filed by Plaintiff Sarah McCracken. (Schubert, Amber)
September 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Sarah McCracken. Related Case(s): 7:21-cv-09421-CS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schubert, Amber)
September 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sarah McCracken, (Schubert, Amber)
September 21, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Sarah McCracken. (Schubert, Amber)
September 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sarah McCracken. (Schubert, Amber)
September 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34027560 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Sarah McCracken. (Attorney Amber Love Schubert added to party Sarah McCracken(pty:pla))(Schubert, Amber)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCracken v. KSF Acquisition Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah McCracken
Represented By: Amber Love Schubert
Represented By: Robert C Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KSF Acquisition Corporation
Represented By: Ricky L Shackelford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?