Cecilia Hodges v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Cecilia Hodges
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Fiesta Ford and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv01696
Filed: September 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Wesley L Hsu
2 Judge: John E McDermott
3 Judge: Hernan D Vera
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION #25 by Judge Hernan D. Vera. The Court continues the filing deadline of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses from October 25, 2023 to December 27, 2023. (lom)
October 20, 2023 Filing 25 Joint STIPULATION to Continue filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Hodges. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna)
October 11, 2023 Filing 24 JUDGMENT by Judge Hernan D. Vera: Plaintiff CECILIA HODGES ("Plaintiff") accepted Defendant Ford Motor Company's ("Defendant") Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 68 on September 7, 2023. Accordingly, the Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $90,000.00 pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68 Offer. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (bm)
October 11, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: [Proposed] Judgment #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Notices-Notice of Lodging. A stand-alone proposed judgment should be e-filed by submitting a Notice of Lodging with the separate, additional attachment of the proposed judgmment In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
October 10, 2023 Filing 22 REQUEST to Enforce Judgment filed by plaintiff Cecilia Hodges. (Dolin, Tionna)
October 10, 2023 Filing 21 REQUEST to Enforce Judgment filed by plaintiff Cecilia Hodges. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 17, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mani Arabi counsel for Plaintiff Cecilia Hodges. Adding Mani Arabi as counsel of record for Cecilia Hodges for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Hodges. (Attorney Mani Arabi added to party Cecilia Hodges(pty:pla))(Arabi, Mani)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (cbr)
July 7, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Cecilia Hodges. Adding Elizabeth Larocque as counsel of record for Cecilia Hodges for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Hodges. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Cecilia Hodges(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
July 7, 2023 Filing 17 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Jun, Patricia)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: Please refer to Order for complete details. (cbr)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 23-073) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Hernan D. Vera, this case is transferred from Judge Wesley L. Hsu to the calendar of Judge Hernan D. Vera for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-01696-HDV-JEMx. (sn)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-039) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-01696 WLH(JEMx). (rn)
February 27, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nino Sanaia counsel for Plaintiff Cecilia Hodges. Adding Nino Sanaia as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Hodges. (Sanaia, Nino)
February 1, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket text and document conflict re: name of attorney. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 31, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nino Sanaia counsel for Plaintiff Cecilia Hodges. Adding Nino Sanaia as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Hodges. (Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Cecilia Hodges(pty:pla))(Sanaia, Nino)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 9/21/2023. LAST DATE TO HEAR MOTIONS is 11/20/2023. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 10/5/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2024 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 1/30/2024 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp)
November 23, 2022 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7, filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Hodges.. (Whang, Steven)
September 28, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on December 1, 2022. (rrp)
September 28, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
September 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Cormac J. Carney. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:22-cv-01696-CJC (JEMx). (et)
September 27, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Fiesta Ford, Ford Motor Company, Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Hodges. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/24/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
September 27, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Hodges pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Defendant Fiesta Ford without prejudice. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 09/16/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 4 AS ATTACHMENT NO. 5 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
September 27, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Fiesta Ford, Ford Motor Company. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/14/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 2 AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
September 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, (Mortenson, Michael)
September 27, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Mortenson, Michael)
September 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number CVPS2200361 Receipt No: ACACDC-34060122 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Mortenson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #7 Exhibit 6 to Decl. of M. Mortenson) (Attorney Michael Donn Mortenson added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Mortenson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cecilia Hodges v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Hodges
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Mani Arabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Michael Donn Mortenson
Represented By: Craig A Taggart
Represented By: Patricia H. Jun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiesta Ford
Represented By: Craig A Taggart
Represented By: Michael Donn Mortenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?