Karley Neeley et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Karley Neeley and Harold Neeley
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv02067
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Campbell counsel for Plaintiffs Harold Neeley, Karley Neeley. Adding Christopher Campbell as counsel of record for Plaintiff(s) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff(s) Karley Neeley and Harold Neeley. (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Harold Neeley(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Karley Neeley (pty:pla))(Campbell, Christopher)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court determines Plaintiffs have failed to demonstrate the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000 and finds that diversity jurisdiction does not exist. The court, therefore, DISMISSES the action without prejudice. All dates and deadlines in this court are VACATED. The clerk of the court shall close the action administratively. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
August 8, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Harold Neeley, Karley Neeley to Order to Show Cause,,, #11 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law, #2 Exhibit 1 (Purchase agreement))(Law, Daniel)
August 8, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiffs Harold Neeley, Karley Neeley. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs KARLEY NEELY and HARODL NEELEY. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Harold Neeley(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Karley Neeley (pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
August 8, 2023 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Karley Neeley. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Karley Neeley for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by PLAINTIFF Karley Neeley. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Karley Neeley (pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The parties are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The parties are encouraged to submit evidence and/or judicially noticeable facts in response to the court's Order. Responses shall be limited to ten (10) pages in length. The parties should consider this Order to be a two-pronged inquiry into the facial and factual sufficiency of Plaintiff's demonstration of jurisdiction. As Plaintiff is the party asserting federal jurisdiction, Plaintiff's failure to respond timely and fully to this Order shall result in dismissal of the action without further notice. (lc)
December 28, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karley Neeley, Harold Neeley, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 12/13/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarai Marin, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER By Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (vdr)
November 23, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant FCA US LLC. (sh)
November 23, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
November 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
November 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (sh)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Harold Neeley, Karley Neeley, identifying FCA US LLC. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Harold Neeley, Karley Neeley. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Harold Neeley, Karley Neeley. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34362373 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Karley Neeley, Harold Neeley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Harold Neeley(pty:pla), Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Karley Neeley (pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karley Neeley et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karley Neeley
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Neeley
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?