Maxon Industries, Inc. v. Dhollandia US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MAXON INDUSTRIES, INC.
Defendant: DHOLLANDIA US, LLC and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2022cv02215
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge George H. Wu. Corrected APPLICATION of Attorney Bryan G. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Dhollandia US, LLC, designating Daniel A. Solitro as local counsel.; granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney Bryan G. Harrison. (aco)
February 10, 2023 Filing 21 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bryan G. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Dhollandia US, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 2/8/2023, Receipt No. 34763897) filed by defendant Dhollandia US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Solitro, Daniel)
February 9, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bryan G. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Dhollandia US, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34763897) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT DHOLLANDIA US, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu. The Court hereby approves the concurrently filed Joint Stipulation to Further Extend Time for Defendant Dhollandia US, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Dhollandia US, LLC must file a response to the Complaint of Plaintiff Maxon Industries, Inc. on or before March 10, 2023. There will be no further extensions. RE: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #18 . (aco)
February 8, 2023 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Dhollandia US, LLC answer now due 3/10/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Dhollandia US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Solitro, Daniel)
February 8, 2023 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bryan G. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Dhollandia US, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34763897) filed by defendant Dhollandia US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Solitro, Daniel)
January 4, 2023 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Dhollandia US, LLC answer now due 2/8/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Dhollandia US, LLC.(Solitro, Daniel)
January 4, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Dhollandia US, LLC, (Solitro, Daniel)
January 4, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Solitro counsel for Defendant Dhollandia US, LLC. Adding Daniel A. Solitro as counsel of record for Dhollandia US, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Dhollandia US, LLC. (Attorney Daniel A Solitro added to party Dhollandia US, LLC(pty:dft))(Solitro, Daniel)
December 27, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maxon Industries, Inc., upon Defendant Dhollandia US, LLC served on 12/21/2022, answer due 1/11/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ryan (Doe) - Employee- Person Apparently in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hankin, Marc)
December 27, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maxon Industries, Inc., upon Defendant Dhollandia US, LLC served on 12/19/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dennis T. - Employee- Person Apparently in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hankin, Marc)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 5:22-CV-02215-GW-AFMx. (npo)
December 19, 2022 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Dhollandia US, LLC. (et)
December 19, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
December 19, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et)
December 16, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by MAXON INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Hankin, Marc)
December 16, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff MAXON INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Hankin, Marc)
December 16, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MAXON INDUSTRIES, INC., identifying DHOLLANDIA US, LLC. (Hankin, Marc)
December 16, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MAXON INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Hankin, Marc)
December 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34493656 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff MAXON INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A to G) (Attorney Marc E. Hankin added to party MAXON INDUSTRIES, INC.(pty:pla))(Hankin, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxon Industries, Inc. v. Dhollandia US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAXON INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Marc E. Hankin
Represented By: Anooj Mayur Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHOLLANDIA US, LLC
Represented By: Daniel A. Solitro
Represented By: Bryan G. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?